EP0870117 - METHOD FOR FIXING TWO ELEMENTS TOGETHER, IN PARTICULAR LINKS OF A METAL WRISTWATCH STRAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEMRY EUROPE N.V. Industrieweg 43 3540 Herk-de-Stad / BE | For all designated states MONTRES ROLEX SA 3-7 rue François-Dussaud 1211 Genève 24 / CH | [1999/45] |
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states MEMRY EUROPE N.V. Industrieweg 43 3540 Herk-de-Stad / BE | ||
For all designated states MONTRES ROLEX SA 5-7 rue François-Dussaud 1211 Genève 24 / CH | |||
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states MEMRY EUROPE N.V. Industrieweg 43 3540 Herk-de-Stad / BE | ||
For all designated states GAY FRERES VENTE ET EXPORTATION S.A. 12, rue des Glacis-de-Rive, Case postale 267 CH-1211 Genève 3 / CH | |||
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states ADVANCED MATERIALS AND TECHNOLOGIES, afgekort " A.M.T.", naamloze vennootschap Industrieweg 43 B-3540 Herk-de-Stad / BE | ||
For all designated states GAY FRERES VENTE ET EXPORTATION S.A. 12, rue des Glacis-de-Rive, Case postale 267 CH-1211 Genève 3 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURLER, Willy, A. 22, rue des Alpes CH-1200 Genève / CH | 02 /
SCHWOB, Jean Pervenches CH-1361 Bassins / CH | 03 /
VAN MOORLEGHEM, Wilfried Roth 21 B-3210 Lubbeek / BE | [1998/42] | Representative(s) | Debrabandere, René, et al BUREAU DE RYCKER Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Belgie N.V. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [1999/40] |
Former [1998/42] | Debrabandere, René BUREAU DE RYCKER Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Belgie N.V. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 96923789.0 | 09.07.1996 | [1998/42] | WO1996BE00074 | Priority number, date | BE19950000614 | 11.07.1995 Original published format: BE 9500614 | [1998/42] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9703294 | Date: | 30.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0870117 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0870117 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16B4/00, F16B19/00, A44C5/02 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
A44C5/10 (EP,US);
A44C5/102 (KR);
A44C27/008 (EP,KR,US);
F16B19/004 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2201/12 (EP,KR,US);
F16B2200/77 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEFESTIGUNG VON ZWEI ELEMENTEN, INSBESONDERE VON GLIEDERN FÜR GLIEDERARMBAND | [1998/42] | English: | METHOD FOR FIXING TWO ELEMENTS TOGETHER, IN PARTICULAR LINKS OF A METAL WRISTWATCH STRAP | [1998/42] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FIXER L'UN A L'AUTRE DEUX ELEMENTS, EN PARTICULIER LES MAILLONS D'UN BRACELET DE MONTRE METALLIQUE | [1998/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.1998 | Translation filed | 06.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 11.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.10.1999 | BE | 20.10.1999 | FI | 20.10.1999 | GR | 20.10.1999 | NL | 20.10.1999 | SE | 20.10.1999 | DK | 20.01.2000 | PT | 20.01.2000 | IE | 09.07.2000 | LU | 09.07.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
FI | 20.10.1999 | ||
GR | 20.10.1999 | ||
NL | 20.10.1999 | ||
SE | 20.10.1999 | ||
DK | 20.01.2000 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
IE | 09.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
FI | 20.10.1999 | ||
NL | 20.10.1999 | ||
SE | 20.10.1999 | ||
DK | 20.01.2000 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
IE | 09.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
FI | 20.10.1999 | ||
NL | 20.10.1999 | ||
SE | 20.10.1999 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
IE | 09.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
FI | 20.10.1999 | ||
SE | 20.10.1999 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
IE | 09.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
FI | 20.10.1999 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
IE | 09.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
FI | 20.10.1999 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
FI | 21.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | BE | 20.10.1999 | |
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
FI | 21.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/23] | FI | 21.01.2000 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2737843 (HERMAN KOEHL) [Y] 1-3,8,9 * column 2, line 23 - line 27 ** column 3, line 35 - line 40; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US3837163 (FUJIMORI Y) [Y] 1-9 * column 3, line 18 - line 20; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US3913444 (OTTE RICHARD F) [Y] 1-3,8,9 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 39; figures 1-5 *; | [A]FR2306782 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [A] 1-4,8,9 * page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 15; figure 1A 1B 16 17; claims 1,13,18 *; | [A]US4036669 (BROOK GREVILLE B, et al) [A] 2,4-6,8 * column 9, line 55 - column 10, line 15 * * column 12, line 8 - line 48 *; | [Y]WO9423214 (ADVANCED MATERIALS TECH [BE], et al) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document * |