EP0833855 - USE OF POLYDIENE DIOLS IN RESILIENT POLYURETHANE FOAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.1999 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.1999 [1999/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CENENS, Jozef, Lucyen, Rudolf 514 Oyster Creek Drive Sugar Land, TX 77478 / US | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Zeestraten, Albertus W. J. Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | Zeestraten, Albertus Wilhelmus Joannes Shell International B.V., Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 96923917.7 | 21.06.1996 | [1998/15] | WO1996EP02762 | Priority number, date | US19950494640 | 23.06.1995 Original published format: US 494640 | [1998/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9700902 | Date: | 09.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0833855 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/62, C08G18/69, // (C08G18/62, 101:00),(C08G18/69, 101:00) | [1998/15] | CPC: |
C08G18/69 (EP);
C08G18/6208 (EP);
C08G2110/0008 (EP);
C08G2110/005 (EP);
C08G2110/0058 (EP);
C08G2110/0083 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/15] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON POLYDIEN-DIOLEN IN ELASTISCHEN POLYURETHANSCHAUMSTOFFEN | [1998/15] | English: | USE OF POLYDIENE DIOLS IN RESILIENT POLYURETHANE FOAMS | [1998/15] | French: | UTILISATION DE DIOLS DE POLYDIENE DANS DES MOUSSES SOUPLES EN POLYURETHANE | [1998/15] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 01.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/14] | 12.11.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0639596 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * page 2, line 57 - page 3, line 12 * * page 5, line 1 - line 14 *; | [A]EP0398125 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1-3 * * page 3, line 27 - line 53 *; | [DA]US4939184 (KENNEDY JOSEPH P [US]) [DA] 1 * claims 1-3 * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 54 * |