Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH11508501 | Global Dossier | 27.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9602833 | 28.06.1996 | DE19524076 | 01.07.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6418496 | Global Dossier | 05.02.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9602833 | 28.06.1996 | DE19524076 | 01.07.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0836549 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2000 | B1 | EP0836549 | 22.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9602833 | 28.06.1996 | DE19524076 | 01.07.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE196442T | 15.10.2000 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP9602833 | 28.06.1996 | DE19524076 | 01.07.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59605920D1 | 26.10.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9602833 | 28.06.1996 | DE19524076 | 01.07.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0836549T | 29.01.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP9602833 | 28.06.1996 | DE19524076 | 01.07.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9702128 | Global Dossier | 23.01.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19524076 | 01.07.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19524076 | 24.10.1996 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE19524076 | 01.07.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2152542T | 01.02.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19524076 | 01.07.1995 |