EP0836549 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A SURFACE-STRUCTURED, SHEET-LIKE SEMIFINISHED PRODUCT MADE FROM A THERMOPLASTIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HCD Hygienic Composites Development GMBH Düsseldorfer Strasse 193 45481 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | [1998/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGNER, Werner Harrenhorst 25 D-31542 Bad Nenndorf / DE | [1998/17] | Representative(s) | Hoffmeister, Helmut Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36 48147 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | Hoffmeister, Helmut, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36 48147 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 96923970.6 | 28.06.1996 | [1998/17] | WO1996EP02833 | Priority number, date | DE1995124076 | 01.07.1995 Original published format: DE 19524076 | [1998/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9702128 | Date: | 23.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0836549 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0836549 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B29C43/22, B29C47/32, B29C41/26 | [1998/17] | CPC: |
B29C59/025 (EP,US);
B23K26/382 (EP);
B23K26/384 (EP);
B29C39/148 (EP);
B29C41/26 (EP);
B29C43/222 (EP);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/13 (EP,US);
B29C48/35 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES OBERFLÄCHENSTRUKTURIERTEN, FOLIENARTIGEN HALBZEUGS AUS EINEM THERMOPLASTEN | [1998/17] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A SURFACE-STRUCTURED, SHEET-LIKE SEMIFINISHED PRODUCT MADE FROM A THERMOPLASTIC | [1998/17] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE UN PRODUIT SEMI-FINI THERMOPLASTIQUE, PELLICULAIRE, A SURFACE STRUCTUREE | [1998/17] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.12.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/17] | 18.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 20.09.2000 | PT | 20.12.2000 | GR | 22.12.2000 | [2004/51] |
Former [2001/29] | FI | 20.09.2000 | |
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/18] | PT | 20.12.2000 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2681294 (BEGUIN ALBERT E) [Y] 1-6,11-15,17,23-26 * column 2, line 4 - line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]US3374303 (METZ JR PETER J) [A] 1* column 2, line 70 - column 3, line 4; figure 1 *; | [Y]US3515778 (FIELDS REUBEN T, et al) [Y] 1-6,11-15,17,23-26 * column 3, line 3 - line 23; figures 1-3,7,8 *; | [A]US3551544 (HLINKA CHARLES F) [A] 1 * column 4, line 26 - line 36; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US3555601 (PRICE HAROLD) [A] 1 * column 3, line 22 - line 61; figures 6,7 *; | [Y]US4445458 (O'BRIEN WILLIAM G [US]) [Y] 1-6,11-15,17,23-26 * column 3, line 32 - line 37; figure 1 * |