EP0839120 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTACTING GAS AND LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lammas Resources Limited Lammas Farm, Upper Benefield Oundle Cambridgeshire PE8 5AN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states Lammas Resources Limited Lammas Farm, Upper Benefield Oundle, Cambridgeshire PE8 5AN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLIS, Stephen, Robert, Mercer 49 Garth Avenue Surby Isle of Man IM9 6QU / GB | 02 /
MOORE, Philip, Coley Lammas Farm Upper Benfield Oundle Cambridgeshire PE8 5AN / GB | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Gregory, Timothy Mark T.M. Gregory & Co., 26 Cyril Street Northampton NN1 5EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | Gregory, Timothy Mark T.M. Gregory & Co., 26 Cyril Street Northampton NN1 5EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96924078.7 | 15.07.1996 | [1998/19] | WO1996GB01683 | Priority number, date | GB19950014541 | 15.07.1995 Original published format: GB 9514541 | [1998/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9703927 | Date: | 06.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0839120 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0839120 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/16, C02F3/12, B01J10/00 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
B01J19/0066 (EP,US);
B01J19/006 (EP,US);
B01J19/2405 (EP,US);
B01J19/26 (EP,US);
C02F3/226 (EP,US);
C12M23/58 (EP,US);
C12M27/00 (EP,US);
C12M29/00 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00108 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0011 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00164 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00772 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/20] |
Former [1998/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | GAS-FLÜSSIGKEIT-KONTAKTVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [1998/19] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTACTING GAS AND LIQUID | [1998/19] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE MISE EN CONTACT D'UN GAZ ET D'UN LIQUIDE | [1998/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/19] | 20.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 24.05.2000 | LU | 15.07.2000 | MC | 31.07.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2002/42] | FI | 24.05.2000 | |
MC | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | FI | 24.05.2000 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2070967 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,19-21 * figures 2,7 *; | [X]DE4138599 (SCHNEIDER WOLFGANG [DE]) [X] 1,19,20,34,36 * abstract *; | [XPA]DE19517444 (STRATE MASCHF [DE]) [XP] 1,6,12,14 * abstract *[A] 27,28 |