Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0786107
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
22.08.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |
04.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] |
02.07.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] |
06.02.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] |
12.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.08.2003 [2003/35] |
04.07.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.07.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.12.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.09.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.09.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.09.1998 |
Change - representative |
published on 11.11.1998 [1998/46] |
09.09.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.08.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.10.1997 [1997/42] |
13.06.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.07.1997 [1997/31] |
11.06.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.05.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.04.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|