EP0837896 - AROMATIC POLYAMIDE, OPTICAL ANISOTROPIC DOPE AND ARTICLES AND PREPARATION FOR THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.1998 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.10.1998 [1998/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kolon Industries Inc. 45, Mugyo-dong Jung-gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states Kolon Industries Inc. 45, Mugyo-dong Jung-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Taejin 153, Gwangmyeongtownhouse 1022-76, Manchon 2-dong Susung-ku Daeku 706-022 / KR | [1998/18] | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M., et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96925142.0 | 12.07.1996 | [1998/18] | WO1996KR00107 | Priority number, date | KR19610000595 | 13.07.1995 Original published format: KR 2061595 | [1998/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9703109 | Date: | 30.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0837896 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 30.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08G69/32, D01F6/60, C08J5/18 | [1998/18] | CPC: |
C08G69/28 (KR);
C08G69/32 (EP,US);
C08G69/38 (KR);
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
D01F6/605 (EP,US);
C08J2377/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AROMATISCHE POLYAMIDE, OPTISCH ANISOTROPES DOPIERMITTEL UND IHRE HERSTELLUNG | [1998/18] | English: | AROMATIC POLYAMIDE, OPTICAL ANISOTROPIC DOPE AND ARTICLES AND PREPARATION FOR THE SAME | [1998/18] | French: | POLYAMIDES AROMATIQUES, DOPANT OPTIQUE ANISOTROPIQUE ET LEUR PREPARATION | [1998/18] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 14.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/42] | 15.05.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.03.1998 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.1998 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.1998 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.1998 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.1998 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.03.1998 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0045934 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]); | [X]US4021415 (CHANG WILLIAM J H) |