EP0847306 - ARRANGEMENT IN A SPRAY TUBE MOUTHPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2000/19] |
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states Astra Aktiebolag 151 85 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NILSON, Billy Hallevadsgatan 2 S-595 35 Mjölby / SE | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Linderoth, Margareta, et al AstraZenaca AB Global Intellectual Property 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Linderoth, Margareta, et al ASTRA AB, Patent Department 151 85 Södertälje / SE | Application number, filing date | 96925216.2 | 04.07.1996 | [1998/25] | WO1996SE00910 | Priority number, date | SE19950002999 | 31.08.1995 Original published format: SE 9502999 | [1998/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9707897 | Date: | 06.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0847306 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0847306 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/34, A61M11/00 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
B05B1/34 (EP,KR,US);
B05B1/3436 (EP,KR,US);
A61M11/02 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/25] | Extension states | LT | 31.03.1998 | LV | 31.03.1998 | SI | 31.03.1998 | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG IN EINEM MUNSTÜCK EINES SPRÜHROHRENS | [1998/25] | English: | ARRANGEMENT IN A SPRAY TUBE MOUTHPIECE | [1998/25] | French: | EMBOUT POUR UN TUBE ATOMISEUR | [1998/25] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 31.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/25] | 21.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1625235 ; | [A]EP0439109 (TAPLAST S N C [IT]) |