Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0883923
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
17.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] |
25.08.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.10.2000 [2000/41] |
10.09.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.10.1999 [1999/43] |
19.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.06.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
27.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.01.1999 |
First examination report |
|
16.01.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
30.10.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.12.1998 [1998/51] |
30.10.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.12.1998 [1998/51] |
01.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.08.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.06.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.10.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.10.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|