EP0883923 - CLOSURE WITH FLOWABLE MATERIAL AND REINFORCING CORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOR, Lawrence, C. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
MOLITOR, Brian, K. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 96925268.3 | 28.06.1996 | [1998/51] | WO1996US11084 | Priority number, date | US19960609361 | 01.03.1996 Original published format: US 609361 | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9732381 | Date: | 04.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0883923 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0883923 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/068, H02G15/184 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
H02G15/068 (EP,US);
H02G15/1833 (EP,US);
H02G15/184 (EP,US);
H02G15/103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/51] | Title | German: | UMHÜLLUNG MIT FLIESSBAREM MATERIAL UND VERSTÄRKUNGSKERN | [1998/51] | English: | CLOSURE WITH FLOWABLE MATERIAL AND REINFORCING CORE | [1998/51] | French: | FERMETURE COMPRENANT UN MATERIAU FLUIDE ET UNE AME RENFORCEE | [1998/51] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 20.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.10.1999 | [2002/27] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0035271 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,13,17,20 * claims 1,11,20 *; | [A]FR2518837 (FABRICATION CABLES ELECT CIE G [FR]) [A] 1,13,17* page 14, line 1 - line 28; figure 2 *; | [AD]EP0424090 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [AD] 1-5,13,17,20 * abstract *; | [AD]DE3943296 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [AD] 1,13,17,20 * abstract *; | [A]WO9116564 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [A] 1,13,17,20 * page 10, paragraph 1; figures 1,7,8; claims 1,17 *; | [AD]EP0547656 (PIRELLI CAVI SPA [IT]) [AD] 1,13,17,20 * abstract *; | [AD]DE4417363 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [AD] 1,13,17,20 * abstract * |