EP0843737 - CO-DOMINANT GENETIC DIAGNOSIS TEST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Association Française contre les Myopathies 1, rue de L'Internationale, B.P. 59 91002 Evry Cédex / FR | [1998/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKMANN, Jacques, S. 95, rue de Paris F-94220 Charenton / FR | 02 /
BOURG, Nathalie 16, rue Victor-Hugo F-91100 Corbeil-Essonnes / FR | 03 /
CAMPBELL, Kevin, P. 931 Evergreen Court Iowa City, IA 52245 / US | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96925784.9 | 12.07.1996 | [1998/22] | WO1996FR01093 | Priority number, date | FR19950009586 | 07.08.1995 Original published format: FR 9509586 | [1998/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9706276 | Date: | 20.02.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0843737 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6858 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/16 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/172 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/22] | Title | German: | KO-DOMINANTER GENETISCHER DIAGNOSETEST | [1998/22] | English: | CO-DOMINANT GENETIC DIAGNOSIS TEST | [1998/22] | French: | TEST CO-DOMINANT DE DIAGNOSTIC GENETIQUE | [1998/22] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/22] | 05.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/33] | 10.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0332435 (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 1-14 * page 9, line 4 - line 24; claims 1-15 * * page 9, line 46 - page 10, line 9 *; | [AD] - DON R.H ET AL., "Touchdown PCR to circumvent spurious priming during gene amplification", NUCLEIC ACID RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 19, no. 4, page 4008, XP002013809 [AD] 4 * the whole document * |