EP0841929 - QUINOLONES AND THEIR THERAPEUTIC USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Darwin Discovery Limited 208 Bath Road Slough Berks SL1 3WE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states Darwin Discovery Limited 208 Bath Road Slough Berks SL1 3WE / GB | ||
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states Darwin Discovery Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | ||
Former [1998/21] | For all designated states Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEASLEY, Steven, Colin, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | 02 /
MONTANA, John, Gary, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | 03 /
DYKE, Hazel, Joan, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | 04 /
HAUGHAN, Alan, Findlay, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | 05 /
RUNCIE, Karen, Ann, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | 06 /
MANALLACK, David, Thomas, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | 07 /
BUCKLEY, George, Martin, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | 08 /
MAXEY, Robert, James, Merck Sharp & Dohme Turnings Park Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | 09 /
KENDALL, Hannah, Jayne, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | 10 /
BAXTER, Andrew, Douglas, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | [2003/19] |
Former [1998/44] | 01 /
BEASLEY, Steven, Colin, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | ||
02 /
MONTANA, John, Gary, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | |||
03 /
DYKE, Hazel, Joan, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | |||
04 /
HAUGHAN, Alan, Findlay, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | |||
05 /
RUNCIE, Karen, Ann, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | |||
06 /
MANALLACK, David, Thomas, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | |||
07 /
BUCKLEY, George, Martin, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | |||
08 /
MAXEY, Robert, James, MERCK SHARP & DOHME Turnings Park Harlow ESSSEX CM20 2QR / GB | |||
09 /
KENDALL, Hannah, Jayne, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | |||
10 /
BAXTER, Andrew, Douglas, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | |||
Former [1998/21] | 01 /
BEASLEY, Steven, Colin, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | ||
02 /
MONTANA, John, Gary, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | |||
03 /
DYKE, Hazel, Joan, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | |||
04 /
HAUGHAN, Alan, Findlay, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | |||
05 /
RUNCIE, Karen, Ann, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | |||
06 /
MANALLACK, David, Thomas, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | |||
07 /
BUCKLEY, George, Martin, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | |||
08 /
MAXEY, Robert, James, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | |||
09 /
KENDALL, Hannah, Jayne, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | |||
10 /
BAXTER, Andrew, Douglas, Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | Perry, Robert Edward, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96925905.0 | 02.08.1996 | [1998/21] | WO1996GB01862 | Priority number, date | GB19950015811 | 02.08.1995 Original published format: GB 9515811 | GB19950026377 | 22.12.1995 Original published format: GB 9526377 | GB19960005868 | 20.03.1996 Original published format: GB 9605868 | GB19960011898 | 07.06.1996 Original published format: GB 9611898 | [1998/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9704779 | Date: | 13.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0841929 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0841929 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/47 | [1998/21] | CPC: |
A61K31/47 (EP,US);
A61K31/444 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/12 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/21] | Title | German: | CHINOLONE UND DEREN THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG | [1998/21] | English: | QUINOLONES AND THEIR THERAPEUTIC USE | [1998/21] | French: | QUINOLONES ET LEUR UTILISATION THERAPEUTIQUE | [1998/21] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/21] | 26.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH02124871 ; | [DA]US3524858 (KAMINSKY DANIEL, et al); | [DA]US4621088 (LARUELLE CLAUDE [FR], et al); | [A]US4786644 (GLAMKOWSKI EDWARD J [US], et al); | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900724), vol. 14, no. 342, Database accession no. (C - 0743), & JP02124871 A 19900514 (DAINIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - Y. NISHIKAWA ET AL., "Oxopyridinecarboxamide derivatives as antiallergic agents.", CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1989), vol. 37, no. 5, pages 1256 - 1259, XP000574079 | [A] - M.N. PALFREYMAN, "Phosphodiesterase type IV inhibitors as antiinflammatory agents.", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (1995), vol. 20, no. 8, pages 793 - 804, XP000575684 | [A] - G. DENT ET AL., "Selective phosphodiesterase inhibitors in the therapy of asthma.", CLIN. IMMUNOTHERAP., (1995), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 423 - 437, XP000575699 | [A] - J.C. LEE ET AL., "Low molecular weight TNF biosynthesis inhibitors: strategies and prospectives.", CIRCULATORY SHOCK, (1994), vol. 44, no. 3, pages 97 - 103, XP000575652 | [A] - D. CAVALLA ET AL., "Phosphodiesterase IV inhibitors: structural diversity and therapeutic potential in asthma.", CURR. MED. CHEM., (1995), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 561 - 572, XP002007898 |