blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0850058

EP0850058 - FACILITATION OF AMPA RECEPTOR-MEDIATED SYNAPTIC TRANSMISSION IN BRAIN AS A TREATMENT FOR SCHIZOPHRENIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.07.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
300 Lakeside Drive
22nd Floor
Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/27]For all designated states
THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA
300 Lakeside Drive, 22nd Floor
Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LARSON, John
Dep.of Pschiatry,MC912 University of Illinois
1601 West Taylor Chicago, Illinois 60612 / US
02 / LYNCH, Gary
4 Gibbs Court
Irvine, CA 92715 / US
03 / ROGERS, Gary, A.
3056 Foothill Road
Santa Barbara, CA 93105 / US
[1998/46]
Former [1998/27]01 / LARSON, John
Apartment L-1, 393 Hamilton Street
Costa Mesa, CA 92627 / US
02 / LYNCH, Gary
4 Gibbs Court
Irvine, CA 92715 / US
03 / ROGERS, Gary, A.
3056 Foothill Road
Santa Barbara, CA 93105 / US
Representative(s)Behnisch, Werner
ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Behnisch, Werner
Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Former [1998/27]Behnisch, Werner, Dr.
Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
Application number, filing date96926176.729.07.1996
[1998/27]
WO1996US12440
Priority number, dateUS1995052102230.08.1995         Original published format: US 521022
[1998/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9707799
Date:06.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0850058
Date:01.07.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.03.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/40, A61K31/535, A61K31/54
[2000/04]
CPC:
A61K31/453 (EP,US); A61K31/36 (EP,US); A61K31/4015 (EP,US);
A61K31/4025 (EP,US); A61K31/4453 (EP,US); A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K31/498 (EP,US); A61K31/536 (EP,US); A61K31/549 (EP,US);
A61K31/5513 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1998/27]A61K31/40
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/27]
Extension statesAL25.03.1998
LT25.03.1998
LV25.03.1998
SI25.03.1998
TitleGerman:ERLEICHTERUNG DER DURCH AMPA REZEPTOR VERMITTELTEN SYNAPTISCHEN ÜBERTRAGUNG IM GEHIRN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER SCHIZOPHRENIE[1998/27]
English:FACILITATION OF AMPA RECEPTOR-MEDIATED SYNAPTIC TRANSMISSION IN BRAIN AS A TREATMENT FOR SCHIZOPHRENIA[1998/27]
French:FACILITATION DE LA TRANSMISSION SYNAPTIQUE DANS LE CERVEAU PAR MEDIATION DU RECEPTEUR DE AMPA POUR TRAITER LA SCHIZOPHRENIE[1998/27]
Entry into regional phase25.03.1998National basic fee paid 
25.03.1998Search fee paid 
25.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
25.03.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
25.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/27]
17.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/36]
05.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
03.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE1470316  (SCHERING AG) [X] 23,26 * claim 40 *;
 [X]US3351595  (DE STEVENS GEORGE, et al) [X] 23 * claims 2,3,5,6 *;
 [X]  - MISHIMA ET AL, "EFFECTS OF ANIRACETAM ON BEHAVIORAL DERANGEMENT AS OBSERVED IN CHOICE REACTION PERFORMANCE IN RATS AND SHUTTLE BEHAVIOR IN MICE", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (1993), vol. 61, no. 1, page 21, XP002124575 [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - KREBS M., "excitatory amino-acids, a new class of neurotransmitters. Pharmacology and functional properties", MEDLINE, (1992), XP002124576 [A] 1-27 * abstract *
    [ ] - KREBS M., ENCEPHALE, (1992), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 271 - 279 [ ] * abstract *
International search[Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 122, Number 23, issued 05 June 1995, PIROTTE et al., "New Pyridothiadiazines, Processes for their Preparation and Pharmaceutical Compositions Containing Them", page 1042, Abstract No. 122:290897z.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.