Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9706941 | Global Dossier | 20.03.1997 | A3 | WO9706941 | 27.02.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US69599996 | 15.08.1996 | CA2156536 | 18.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU715444B | Global Dossier | 03.02.2000 | B2 | AU6654096 | 12.03.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | CA9600554 | 16.08.1996 | CA2156536 | 18.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0848659 | Global Dossier | 15.12.1999 | B1 | EP0848659 | 24.06.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CA9600554 | 16.08.1996 | US69599996 | 15.08.1996 | CA2156536 | 18.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2156536 | 29.05.2001 | C | CA2156536 | 19.02.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69599996 | 15.08.1996 | CA2156536 | 18.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69605675T | 08.06.2000 | T2 | DE69605675D1 | 20.01.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CA9600554 | 16.08.1996 | CA2156536 | 18.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5794662 | 18.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US69599996 | 15.08.1996 | CA2156536 | 18.08.1995 |