EP0848659 - PIPE LINER AND METHOD OF INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.11.2000 [2000/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states St. Onge, Henri Stanislaus 226 Catalina Drive West Hill Ontario M1E 1B7 / CA | For all designated states St. Onge, Bryan 226 Catalina Drive West Hill Ontario M1E 1B7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states St. Onge, Henri Stanislaus 226 Catalina Drive West Hill, Ontario M1E 1B7 / CA | ||
For all designated states St. Onge, Bryan 226 Catalina Drive West Hill, Ontario M1E 1B7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | Brooks, Nigel Samuel Hill Hampton East Meon Petersfield, Hampshire GU32 1QN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | Brooks, Nigel Samuel Hill Hampton East Meon Petersfield Hampshire GU32 1QN / GB | Application number, filing date | 96926304.5 | 16.08.1996 | [1998/26] | WO1996CA00554 | Priority number, date | CA19952156536 | 18.08.1995 Original published format: CA 2156536 | [1998/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9706941 | Date: | 27.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0848659 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0848659 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B29C63/34, F16L55/165, // B29K27:06 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
F16L55/1654 (EP,US);
B29C63/34 (EP,US);
B29C65/00 (EP,US);
B29K2027/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/26] | Title | German: | ROHRAUSKLEIDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ANBRINGEN | [1998/26] | English: | PIPE LINER AND METHOD OF INSTALLATION | [1998/26] | French: | REVETEMENT DE CANALISATION ET SON PROCEDE D'INSTALLATION | [1998/26] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 16.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4496499 (BRITTAIN PERRY N [CA], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 9 * * column 6, line 26 - line 44 * * column 10, line 54 - column 11, line 56 *; | [PX]JPH08127069 ; | [A]WO8807154 (PERSSON KJELL [SE]) [A] 1,3,6-8,11,12 * page 5, line 6 - page 6, line 8 * * page 2, line 20 - line 24 * * figure 1 *; | [A]CA1164816 (DURATRON SYSTEMS LIMITED) [A] 1-3,6 * page 3, line 10 - line 27 * * figure -; claims 1-9 *; | [A]DE3129870 (ROGALSKI GUENTER) [A] 1,3,4 * page 12 - page 16 * * figure - *; | [A]WO9201189 (WAVIN BV [NL]) [A] 1,2,11 * page 2, line 11 - page 5, line 13 * * figure - * | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 30, Database accession no. 96-295108, XP002022927 & JPH08127069 A 19960521 (TAKIRON KK) [PX] 1-12 * abstract * |