blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0839211

EP0839211 - RIBOFLAVIN-PRODUCTION PROCESS BY MEANS OF MICRO-ORGANISMS WITH MODIFIED ISOCITRATLYASE ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.04.2002
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH
Postfach 19 13
52428 Jülich / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
For all designated states
FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JÜLICH GMBH
Postfach 19 13
52428 Jülich / DE
Former [1998/19]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
For all designated states
FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JÜLICH GMBH
Postfach 19 13
52428 Jülich / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KÄSLER, Bruno
Magdeburger Strasse 72
D-67071 Ludwigshafen / DE
02 / SAHM, Hermann
Wendelinusstrasse 71
D-52428 Jülich / DE
03 / STAHMANN, Klaus-Peter
Wilhelmstrasse 11
D-52428 Jülich / DE
04 / SCHMIDT, Georg
Heerstrasse 10
D-52457 Aldenhoven / DE
05 / BÖDDECKER, Theo
Robert-Koch-Strasse 7
D-52428 Jülich / DE
06 / SEULBERGER, Harald
Adalbert-Stifter-Strasse 4
D-69221 Dossenheim / DE
[1998/19]
Application number, filing date96926334.210.07.1996
[1998/19]
WO1996EP03009
Priority number, dateDE199512528113.07.1995         Original published format: DE 19525281
DE199514546806.12.1995         Original published format: DE 19545468
[1998/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9703208
Date:30.01.1997
Language:DE
[1997/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0839211
Date:06.05.1998
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0839211
Date:06.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.01.1997
ClassificationIPC:C12P25/00, C12N15/60, C12N15/31
[1998/19]
CPC:
C07D475/14 (EP,US); C12P25/00 (EP,KR,US); A23K20/174 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/19]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON RIBOFLAVIN MITTELS MIKROORGANISMEN MIT VERÄNDERTER ISOCITRATLYASE-AKTIVITÄT[1998/19]
English:RIBOFLAVIN-PRODUCTION PROCESS BY MEANS OF MICRO-ORGANISMS WITH MODIFIED ISOCITRATLYASE ACTIVITY[1998/19]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE RIBOFLAVINE AU MOYEN DE MICRO-ORGANISMES A ACTIVITE D'ISOCITRATLYASE MODIFIEE[1998/19]
Entry into regional phase04.12.1997National basic fee paid 
04.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/19]
08.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.12.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2001Fee for grant paid
12.01.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
16.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP0405370  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [AD] 1-11 * column W *;
 [AD]WO9303183  (TRANSKARYOTIC THERAPIES INC [US]) [AD] 1-11* the whole document *;
 [XP]  - SCHMIDT, G. ET AL., "Inhibition of purified isocitrate lyase identified itaconate and oxalate as potentioal antimetabolites for the riboflavin overproducer Ashbya gossypii", MICROBIOLOGY, READING U.K., (1996), vol. 142, no. 2, pages 411 - 417, XP002020315 [XP] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [XP]  - SCHNMIDT, G. ET AL., "Correlation of isocitrate lyase activity and riboflavin formation in the riboflavin overproducer Ashbya gossypii", MICROBIOLOGY, READING, U.K., (1996), vol. 142, no. 2, pages 419 - 426, XP002020316 [XP] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BARTH, G. UND SCHEUBER, T., "Cloning of the isocitrate lyase gene (ICL1) from Yarrowia lipolytica and characterization of the deduced protein", MOL. GEN. GENET., (1993), vol. 241, pages 422 - 430, XP002020317 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.