EP0786428 - WEB LATERAL STRETCHING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2001 Database last updated on 22.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS CO., LTD. 3-1, Uchisaiwai-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | For all designated states POLYMER PROCESSING RESEARCH INSTITUTE LIMITED 9-2 Kaga 1-chome, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173 / JP | [1997/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURIHARA, Kazuhiko 11-5-1002 Takashimadaira 3-chome, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 175 / JP | 02 /
YAZAWA, Hiroshi 25-15, Higashi 2-chome Kunitachi-shi, Tokyo 186 / JP | 03 /
KUROIWA, Yuki 1-6-103, Tate 1-chome Shiki-shi, Saitama 353 / JP | 04 /
MURAKAMI, Shuichi 33-5, Itabashi 4-chome, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173 / JP | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 96926585.9 | 07.08.1996 | [1997/31] | WO1996JP02230 | Priority number, date | JP19950231904 | 07.08.1995 Original published format: JP 23190495 | [1997/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9706086 | Date: | 20.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786428 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0786428 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.02.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65H23/022 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
B65H23/0258 (EP,US);
B65H23/022 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1997/31] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ausbreiten einer Bahn | [1997/33] | English: | WEB LATERAL STRETCHING APPARATUS | [1997/31] | French: | APPAREIL POUR ETIRER LATERALEMENT UNE BANDE | [1997/31] |
Former [1997/31] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR QUERAUSDEHNUNG EINES BANDES | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.1997 | Translation filed | 07.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.1997 | Search fee paid | 07.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 30.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2071625 (EBERLIN EDGAR ANTHONY) [A] 1 * page 1, line 31 - line 35 * * page 1, line 41 - line 49 ** page 2, line 40 - line 68; figure - * | International search | [A]JPS56151246U ; | [A]JPS5847746 (TOYO KIKAI KK); | [A]JPS6036956U ; | [A]JPS6190532U ; | [A]JPH06255851 (TOSHIBA CORP) |