EP0846987 - MECHANICAL TIMEPIECE WITH TOURBILLON MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2001 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.2001 [2001/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOHKOKU, Muneo, Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Tsuyoshi, Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261 / JP | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al J. MILLER & CO. 9 John Street London WC1N 4JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96926618.8 | 09.08.1996 | [1998/24] | WO1996JP02266 | Priority number, date | JP19950210784 | 18.08.1995 Original published format: JP 21078495 | [1998/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9707435 | Date: | 27.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0846987 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0846987 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.02.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G04B17/28, G04B19/02 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
G04B17/285 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1998/24] | Title | German: | MECHANISCHE UHR MIT TOURBILLONMECHANISMUS | [1998/24] | English: | MECHANICAL TIMEPIECE WITH TOURBILLON MECHANISM | [1998/24] | French: | HORLOGERIE MECANIQUE A MECANISME TOURBILLON | [1998/24] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.1997 | Translation filed | 03.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.1997 | Search fee paid | 03.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 06.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 02.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH262017 (VUILLEUMIER MARCEL [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]CH254850 (VUILLEUMIER MARCEL [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH0843546 (OMEGA SA) |