EP0791246 - SIGNAL PROCESSING WITH SAMPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1997/35] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DE PLASSCHE, Rudy, Johan Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VENES, Arnoldus, Gerardus, Wilhelmus Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1997/35] | Representative(s) | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1997/35] | Kooiman, Josephus Johannes Antonius, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 96927168.3 | 02.09.1996 | [1997/35] | WO1996IB00886 | Priority number, date | EP19950202444 | 08.09.1995 Original published format: EP 95202444 | [1997/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9709787 | Date: | 13.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0791246 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0791246 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/00, H03M1/36 | [1997/35] | CPC: |
H03M1/1245 (EP,US);
H03M1/00 (KR);
H03M1/141 (EP,US);
H03M1/203 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/35] | Title | German: | SIGNALVERARBEITUNG MIT ABTASTUNG | [1997/35] | English: | SIGNAL PROCESSING WITH SAMPLING | [1997/35] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX AVEC ECHANTILLONNAGE | [1997/35] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/46] | 08.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 19.12.2001 | IT | 19.12.2001 | DE | 20.03.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 19.12.2001 | |
DE | 20.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | DE | 20.03.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5307067 (KIMURA HIROSHI [JP], et al) | [X] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, Volume SC-22, No. 6, December 1987, VAN DE GRIFT, "An 8-Bit Video ADC Incorporating Folding and Interpolation Techniques", pages 944-945. | Examination | US5248973 |