EP0862992 - PACKING MATERIAL, BASE MATERIAL FOR ADHESIVE TAPE, OR SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAKAWA, Masaaki Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Kihachi Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567 / JP | 03 /
GOTO, Kazuhito Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567 / JP | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96927210.3 | 20.08.1996 | [1998/37] | WO1996JP02329 | Priority number, date | JP19950211651 | 21.08.1995 Original published format: JP 21165195 | [1998/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9706947 | Date: | 27.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0862992 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.02.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/06, B32B27/00, C09J7/02 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
B32B7/06 (EP,KR);
B32B27/00 (KR);
B65D75/26 (EP);
B65D75/52 (EP);
C09J7/203 (EP);
C09J7/22 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/37] | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSMATERIAL, TRÄGERMATERIAL FÜR KLEBEBAND ODER TRENNFILM | [1998/37] | English: | PACKING MATERIAL, BASE MATERIAL FOR ADHESIVE TAPE, OR SEPARATOR | [1998/37] | French: | MATERIAU D'EMBALLAGE, MATERIAU DE BASE POUR RUBAN ADHESIF OU SEPARATEUR | [1998/37] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.1998 | Translation filed | 10.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.1998 | Search fee paid | 10.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 10.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 04.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/36] | 07.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH03184543 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JPH06503587 |