Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0843587
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
09.06.2000 |
Refusal of application |
published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] |
29.02.2000 |
Application refused |
|
05.11.1999 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.12.1999 [1999/51] |
14.09.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.09.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.07.1999 |
First examination report |
|
13.07.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.09.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.04.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.05.1998 [1998/22] |
09.04.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.05.1998 [1998/22] |
19.03.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.08.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.04.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|