Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0843587 | Global Dossier | 27.05.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9603407 | 02.08.1996 | DE19621492 | 29.05.1996 | DE19529649 | 11.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL183958B | 30.08.2002 | B1 | PL323834 | 27.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9603407 | 02.08.1996 | DE19529649 | 11.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RO119693 | 28.02.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP9603407 | 02.08.1996 | DE19621492 | 29.05.1996 | DE19529649 | 11.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6077328 | 20.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9603407 | 02.08.1996 | DE19621492 | 29.05.1996 | DE19529649 | 11.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA966763 | 18.02.1997 | B | Priority number | Date | DE19529649 | 11.08.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9706876 | Global Dossier | 27.02.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19621492 | 29.05.1996 | DE19529649 | 11.08.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2225654 | 27.02.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19621492 | 29.05.1996 | DE19529649 | 11.08.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19621492 | 13.02.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19621492 | 29.05.1996 | DE19529649 | 11.08.1995 |