EP0843587 - PROCESS FOR REDUCING THE DIOXIN AND FURAN CONTENT IN WASTE GASES FROM FURNACES, AND USE OF THE FILTER DUSTS PRODUCED THEREBY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Soda Deutschland GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [1999/51] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states Solvay Alkali GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROCKHOFF, Reiner Obertalstrasse 7a D-45478 Mülheim / DE | 02 /
HARTMANN, Klaus Goldregenweg 46 D-41468 Neuss / DE | 03 /
HÖLTJE, Jens Neuer Weg 99 D-47803 Krefeld / DE | 04 /
KORTE, Hans-Jürgen Geibelstrasse 9 D-40235 Düsseldorf / DE | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Lauer, Dieter Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Lauer, Dieter, Dr. Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 96927659.1 | 02.08.1996 | [1998/22] | WO1996EP03407 | Priority number, date | DE1995129649 | 11.08.1995 Original published format: DE 19529649 | DE1996121492 | 29.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19621492 | [1998/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9706876 | Date: | 27.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0843587 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/70, C22B21/00 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
B01D53/70 (EP,US);
C22B21/0092 (EP,US);
C22B7/02 (EP,US);
B01D2251/304 (EP,US);
B01D2251/606 (EP,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERMINDERUNG DES DIOXIN- UND FURANGEHALTES IN OFENABGASEN UND NUTZUNG DER DABEI ANFALLENDEN FILTERSTÄUBE | [1998/22] | English: | PROCESS FOR REDUCING THE DIOXIN AND FURAN CONTENT IN WASTE GASES FROM FURNACES, AND USE OF THE FILTER DUSTS PRODUCED THEREBY | [1998/22] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE LA TENEUR EN DIOXINE ET EN FURANE DANS DES GAZ BRULES DE FOURS ET UTILISATION DES POUSSIERES DE FILTRAGE PRODUITES A CETTE OCCASION | [1998/22] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/22] | 16.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2000/30] | 16.03.2000 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2114417 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG, et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]US4368070 (FRACCHIA PIERLUIGI [IT]) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 33 - column 4, line 14; figure . *; | [X]DE3941894 (STEINMUELLER GMBH L & C [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 2, line 62 - column 4, line 9; figure 1; claims 1-10 *; | [A]DE4109991 (METALLWARENFABRIK STOCKACH GMBH) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9527555 (AUSTRIA METALL [AT]) [PX] 1,2,4-7 * the whole document * |