blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0841992

EP0841992 - SURFACE TREATMENT METHOD FOR SKIN-CONTACTING METALLIC OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LESAGE, Christian
44, rue Gustave Flaubert
F-50110 Tourlaville / FR
[1998/21]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/21]
Representative(s)L'Helgoualch, Jean
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[N/P]
Former [1998/21]L'Helgoualch, Jean
Cabinet Sueur et L'Helgoualch 78, rue Carnot
95240 Cormeilles-en-Parisis / FR
Application number, filing date96927745.805.08.1996
[1998/21]
WO1996FR01249
Priority number, dateFR1995000950004.08.1995         Original published format: FR 9509500
[1998/21]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9705966
Date:20.02.1997
Language:FR
[1997/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0841992
Date:20.05.1998
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0841992
Date:22.03.2000
Language:FR
[2000/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.02.1997
ClassificationIPC:B05D7/18, A44C27/00
[1998/21]
CPC:
B05D7/18 (EP); A44C27/007 (EP); C09D101/10 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/21]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER OBERFLÄCHE VON METALLISCHEN GEGENSTÄNDE, DIE AUF DER HAUT GETRAGEN WERDEN[1999/22]
English:SURFACE TREATMENT METHOD FOR SKIN-CONTACTING METALLIC OBJECTS[1998/21]
French:PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE LA SURFACE D'OBJETS METALLIQUES DESTINES A ETRE PORTES AU CONTACT DE LA PEAU[1998/21]
Former [1998/21]VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DER OBERFLÄCHE VON METALLISCHEN GEGENSTÄNDE DIE IM HAUT GETRAGEN WERDEN
Entry into regional phase06.02.1998National basic fee paid 
06.02.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
06.02.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/21]
29.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.1999Fee for grant paid
28.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.03.2000
FI22.03.2000
GR22.03.2000
NL22.03.2000
SE22.03.2000
DK22.06.2000
PT23.06.2000
MC31.08.2000
[2004/07]
Former [2003/46]AT22.03.2000
FI22.03.2000
NL22.03.2000
SE22.03.2000
DK22.06.2000
PT23.06.2000
MC31.08.2000
Former [2003/09]AT22.03.2000
FI22.03.2000
NL22.03.2000
SE22.03.2000
PT23.06.2000
MC31.08.2000
Former [2002/42]AT22.03.2000
FI22.03.2000
SE22.03.2000
PT23.06.2000
MC31.08.2000
Former [2002/23]AT22.03.2000
FI22.03.2000
SE22.03.2000
PT23.06.2000
Former [2001/50]AT22.03.2000
FI22.03.2000
IE22.03.2000
PT23.06.2000
Former [2001/29]AT22.03.2000
FI22.03.2000
PT23.06.2000
Former [2001/09]AT22.03.2000
PT23.06.2000
Former [2001/08]AT22.03.2000
Cited inInternational search[DA]JPH02134314  ;
 [A]US4761971  (FREIER MARILYN H [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US4861658  (GRIFFIN DONALD L [US], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE3917376  (NEGRI DAVIDE [IT]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900810), vol. 014, no. 370, Database accession no. (C - 0747), & JP02134314 A 19900523 (OSAMU HISANAGA) [DA] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.