EP0792469 - INTEGRATED OPTICAL CIRCUIT COMPRISING A POLARIZATION CONVERTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For:SE
PHILIPS NORDEN AB Kottbygatan 7, Kista 164 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For:DE
FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:SE
PHILIPS NORDEN AB Kottbygatan 7, Kista 164 85 Stockholm / SE | |||
Former [1997/36] | For:DE
FR
GB
IT
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:SE
PHILIPS NORDEN AB Kottbygatan 7, Kista 164 85 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DAM, Cornelis Lissenvaart 98 NL-2724 SN Zoetermeer / NL | 02 /
HEIDRICH, Helmut Schneeballenweg 18 D-12357 Berlin / DE | 03 /
HAMACHER, Karl, Michael Schliepenstrasse 3 D-13507 Berlin / DE | 04 /
STEENBERGEN, Cornelis, Adrianus, Marinus Bauxietpad 1 NL-2628 SB Delft / NL | 05 /
SMIT, Meint, Koert Gruttohof 10 NL-2623 PA Delft / NL | 06 /
WEINERT, Carl, Michael Potsdamerstrasse 64 D-12205 Berlin / DE | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | Visser, Derk, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | Visser, Derk, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 96927847.2 | 11.09.1996 | [1997/36] | WO1996IB00922 | Priority number, date | EP19950202541 | 20.09.1995 Original published format: EP 95202541 | EP19950202957 | 02.11.1995 Original published format: EP 95202957 | [1997/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9711396 | Date: | 27.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0792469 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/14, G02F1/035 | [1997/36] | CPC: |
G02B6/12011 (EP,US);
G02B6/12023 (EP,US);
G02B6/126 (EP,US);
G02F1/225 (EP,US);
G02F2203/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/36] | Title | German: | EIN EINEN POLARISATIONSWANDLER ENTHALTENDER INTEGRIERTER OPTISCHER SCHALTKREIS | [1997/36] | English: | INTEGRATED OPTICAL CIRCUIT COMPRISING A POLARIZATION CONVERTOR | [1997/36] | French: | CIRCUIT OPTIQUE INTEGRE COMPRENANT UN CONVERTISSEUR DE POLARISATION | [1997/36] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 08.10.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4220395 (CROW JOHN D [US], et al); | [A]WO9522070 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) |