EP0843774 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLED FRAGMENTATION OF HARD ROCK AND CONCRETE BY THE COMBINATION USE OF IMPACT HAMMERS AND SMALL CHARGE BLASTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RockTek Limited Butler Street Pinjarra Western Australia / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1999/06] | For all designated states RockTek Limited Butler Street Pinjarra, Western Australia / AU | ||
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states Bolinas Technologies, Inc. 22910 Pinecrest Road Golden, CO 80401 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATSON, John, David 34804 West Meadow Road Evergreen, CO 80439 / US | 02 /
MICKE, Brian, P. 22901 Pinecrest Road Golden, CO 80401 / US | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives Cambridge PE27 5PD / GB | ||
Former [1998/22] | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss, 5 Crown Street St. Ives, Cambridge PE17 4EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 96928068.4 | 07.08.1996 | [1998/22] | WO1996US12801 | Priority number, date | US19950001956 | 07.08.1995 Original published format: US 1956 | [1998/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9706348 | Date: | 20.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0843774 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0843774 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.02.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E21C37/14, F42D3/04, E21C37/12, E21C25/02, E21B1/36 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
E21C37/16 (EP,US);
E21B7/02 (EP,US);
E21C25/02 (EP,US);
E21C37/00 (EP,US);
E21C37/12 (EP,US);
E21C37/14 (KR);
F42D3/04 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/10] | E21C3/02, E21C37/14, F42D3/04, E21C37/12, E21C25/02 | ||
Former IPC [1998/22] | E21C3/02, E21C37/14, F42D3/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, PT, SE [1998/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM KONTROLLIERTEN ZERBRECHEN VON HARTEM GESTEIN UND BETON, MITTELS KOMBINIERTEN VERWENDUNGEN VON SCHLAGHAMMERN UND KLEINEN SPRENGLADUNGEN | [2003/12] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLED FRAGMENTATION OF HARD ROCK AND CONCRETE BY THE COMBINATION USE OF IMPACT HAMMERS AND SMALL CHARGE BLASTING | [1998/22] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA FRAGMENTATION MAITRISEE DE ROCHE DURE ET DE BETON PAR L'UTILISATION COMBINEE DE MARTEAUX A PERCUSSION ET D'EXPLOSIONS DE FAIBLE CHARGE | [1998/22] |
Former [1998/22] | VERFAHREN ZUM KONTROLLIERTEN ZERBRECHEN VON HARTEM GESTEIN UND BETON, MITTELS KOMBINIERTEN VERWENDUNGEN VON SCHLAGHAMMERN UND KLEINE SPRENGLADUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.1998 | Search fee paid | 02.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/22] | 28.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.11.2003 | CH | 05.11.2003 | ES | 05.11.2003 | FI | 05.11.2003 | FR | 05.11.2003 | IT | 05.11.2003 | LI | 05.11.2003 | GR | 05.02.2004 | SE | 05.02.2004 | DE | 06.02.2004 | PT | 05.04.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/16] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
ES | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
FR | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
FR | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 05.02.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4080000 (PAURAT FRIEDRICH-WILHELM); | [A]US5098163 (YOUNG CHAPMAN III [US]); | [A]US5308149 (WATSON JOHN D [US], et al) |