EP0851875 - DNA SEQUENCES AND SECRETED PROTEINS ENCODED THEREBY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genetics Institute, LLC 87 Cambridge Park Drive Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | [2002/26] |
Former [1998/28] | For all designated states GENETICS INSTITUTE, INC. 87 Cambridge Park Drive Cambridge, Massachusetts 02140 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBS, Kenneth 151 Beaumont Avenue Newton, MA 02160 / US | 02 /
MCCOY, John, M. 63 Pine Ridge Road Reading, MA 01867 / US | 03 /
KELLEHER, Kerry 50 Hurley Circle Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | 04 /
CARLIN, McKeough 16 Chauncy Street 22 Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [1998/28] | Representative(s) | Frohwitter, Bernhard, et al Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | Frohwitter, Bernhard, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96928092.4 | 08.08.1996 | [1998/28] | WO1996US12897 | Priority number, date | US19950514014 | 11.08.1995 Original published format: US 514014 | [1999/09] |
Former [1998/28] | deleted | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9707198 | Date: | 27.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0851875 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47 | [1998/28] | CPC: |
C07K14/523 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/28] | Title | German: | DNA-SEQUENZEN UND DADURCH KODIERTE SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE | [1998/28] | English: | DNA SEQUENCES AND SECRETED PROTEINS ENCODED THEREBY | [1998/28] | French: | SEQUENCES D'ADN ET PROTEINES SECRETEES CODEES PAR CELLES-CI | [1998/28] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/28] | 11.03.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO9704097 (GENETICS INST [US]) [E] 51-60 * Seq.ID:1/2; page 33 - page 34 * * page 39 - page 42; claim - *; | [A]WO9518826 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [A] 51-60 * page 50 - page 63 *; | [A]US4914025 (MANOIL COLIN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [T]US5536637 (JACOBS KENNETH [US]) | [X] - MIYAKE ET AL., "RP105, a novel B cell surface molecule implicated in B cell activation, is a member of the Leucine-rich repeat protein family", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (19950401), vol. 154, no. 7, pages 3333 - 3340, XP002032346 [X] 11-19 * abstract * * page 3336; figure 2 * * page 3337, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 3338; figure 4 * | [PX] - MARRA ET AL., "The WashU-HHMI mouse EST project", EMBL ENTRY MM04637, (19960615), XP002032347 [PX] 21-29 * abstract * | [ ] - Unpublished | [PX] - MARRA ET AL., "The WashU-HHMI mouse EST project", EMBL ENTRY MM3831, (19960427), XP002032348 [PX] 21-29 * abstract * | [PX] - MARRA ET AL., "The WashU-HHMI mouse EST project", EMBL ENTRY MM93010, (19960504), XP002032349 [PX] 21-29 * abstract * | [PX] - MARRA ET AL., "The WashU-HHMI mouse EST project", EMBL ENTRY MM1705, (19960429), XP002032350 [PX] 21-24 * abstract * | [PX] - FUJIWARA ET AL., EMBL ENTRY HS309B01B, (19950829), XP002032351 [PX] 41-44 * abstract * | [A] - ENG MONG LIM ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF MYCOBACTERIUM TUBERCULOSIS DNA SEQUENCES ENCODING EXPORTED PROTEINS BY USING PHOA GENE FUSIONS", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (19950101), vol. 177, no. 1, pages 59 - 65, XP000560419 | [A] - JACOBS ET AL., "A novel method for isolating eukaryotic cDNA clones encoding secreted proteins", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, (19950310), vol. 21A, page 19, XP002027246 |