EP0865693 - SYSTEM FOR FREQUENCY DIVISION DUPLEX/TIME DIVISION DUPLEX RADIO FREQUENCY COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/39] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FREQUENCY DIVISION DUPLEX/TIME DIVISION DUPLEX RADIO FREQUENCY COMMUNICATIONS | ||
[1999/13] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. 5204 East Ben White Boulevard M/S 562 Austin TX 78741 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | For all designated states Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. Mail Stop 562, 5204 East Ben White Boulevard Austin, TX 78741 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGNA, Javier, V. 12300 Wycliff Lane Austin, TX 78727-5232 / US | [1998/39] | Representative(s) | Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al Brookes Batchellor 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96928257.3 | 22.08.1996 | [1998/39] | WO1996US13534 | Priority number, date | US19950567133 | 04.12.1995 Original published format: US 567133 | [1998/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9721287 | Date: | 12.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0865693 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
H04B7/2621 (EP,US);
H04B7/2615 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1998/39] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR FUNKÜBERTRAGUNG MIT FREQUENZ DUPLEX UND ZEIT DUPLEX VERSCHACHTELUNG | [1999/13] | English: | SYSTEM FOR FREQUENCY DIVISION DUPLEX/TIME DIVISION DUPLEX RADIO FREQUENCY COMMUNICATIONS | [1999/13] | French: | SYSTEME RELATIF AUX COMMUNICATIONS HAUTE FREQUENCE EN DUPLEX PAR REPARTITION EN FREQUENCE ET REPARTITION TEMPORELLE | [1999/13] |
Former [1998/39] | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR FUNKÜBERTRAGUNG MIT FREQUENZ DUPLEX UND ZEIT DUPLEX VERSCHACHTELUNG | ||
Former [1998/39] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FREQUENCY DIVISION DUPLEX/TIME DIVISION DUPLEX RADIO FREQUENCY COMMUNICATIONS | ||
Former [1998/39] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE RELATIFS AUX COMMUNICATIONS HAUTE FREQUENCE EN DUPLEX PAR REPARTITION EN FREQUENCE ET REPARTITION TEMPORELLE | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/39] | 23.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/11] | 18.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2000/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5134710 (AANGSTROEM KERBERG DAG E [SE]) [X] 1-19 * figures 1-7; claims 1-4 *; | [X]EP0677930 (ALCATEL MOBILE COMM FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1-19 * figures 1-8; claims 1-18 *; | [X]WO9317507 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-19 * page 9, line 1 - page 11, line 30; figures 1-12 *; | [X]WO9525406 (TELSTRA CORP LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-19 * page 4, line 26 - page 8, line 10; figures 1-5 *; | [X]EP0637144 (ITALTEL SPA [IT]) [X] 1-19 * column 4, line 1 - line 53 * |