blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0859655

EP0859655 - WATER TREATMENT DEVICE FOR DEGASSING AND/OR DE-SLUDGING WATER IN PIPES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stücklin & Cie AG
Mühlerainstrasse 26
4414 Füllinsdorf / CH
[1998/35]
Inventor(s)01 / FRIEDRICH, Helmut
Schauenburger Strasse 29
CH-4410 Liestal / CH
[1998/35]
Representative(s)Bollhalder, Renato, et al
Bohest AG
Holbeinstrasse 36-38
4051 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Bollhalder, Renato, et al
A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Patentanwälte VSP Holbeinstrasse 36-38
4051 Basel / CH
Former [1998/35]Ullrich, Gerhard, Dr., et al
A. Braun, Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38
4051 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date96928308.410.09.1996
[1998/35]
WO1996CH00308
Priority number, dateCH1995000256811.09.1995         Original published format: CH 256895
[1998/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9710037
Date:20.03.1997
Language:DE
[1997/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0859655
Date:26.08.1998
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0859655
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.03.1997
ClassificationIPC:B01D19/00, B01D35/10, C02F1/20
[1998/35]
CPC:
B01D19/0063 (EP); B01D19/0042 (EP); B01D35/10 (EP);
B01D35/18 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1998/35]
TitleGerman:WASSERKONDITIONIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTGASUNG UND/ODER ENTSCHLAMMUNG VON WASSER IN LEITUNGEN[1998/35]
English:WATER TREATMENT DEVICE FOR DEGASSING AND/OR DE-SLUDGING WATER IN PIPES[1998/35]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE L'EAU POUR DEGAZER ET/OU NETTOYER L'EAU CIRCULANT DANS DES CONDUITES[1998/35]
Entry into regional phase26.02.1998National basic fee paid 
26.02.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
26.02.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/35]
14.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
18.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
20.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.1999Fee for grant paid
15.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
DK19.04.2000
AT10.09.2000
BE30.09.2000
[2004/07]
Former [2003/46]ES19.01.2000
DK19.04.2000
AT10.09.2000
BE30.09.2000
Former [2002/27]ES19.01.2000
AT10.09.2000
BE30.09.2000
Former [2002/15]AT10.09.2000
BE30.09.2000
Former [2002/02]BE30.09.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS58202005  ;
 [A]JPS58214307  ;
 [A]CH589462  (SEMPERIT AG) [A] 1 * figure 4; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0280052  (DONGBEI POWER COLLEGE [CN]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [AD]EP0391484  (FLAMCO BV [NL]) [AD] 1 * figure 2; claim 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840222), vol. 8, no. 41, Database accession no. (C - 211)<1478>, & JP58202005 A 00000000 (TOUYOU FUIRUTAA KOGYO K.K.) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840323), vol. 8, no. 62, & JP58214307 A 19831213 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K.) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.