EP0839199 - PAPILLOMAVIRUSES, AGENTS FOR DETECTING THEM AND FOR TREATING DISEASES CAUSED BY SUCH VIRUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | Refusal of application | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAMANIN, Vladimir Langgewann 5 D-69121 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
DE VILLIERS-ZUR HAUSEN, Ethel-Michele Am Scheibling 6 D-69493 Hirschberg / DE | 03 /
ZUR HAUSEN, Harald Am Scheibling 6 D-69493 Hirschberg / DE | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea, et al Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | Schüssler, Andrea, Dr., et al Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96928326.6 | 19.07.1996 | [1998/19] | WO1996DE01369 | Priority number, date | DE1995126386 | 19.07.1995 Original published format: DE 19526386 | [1998/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9704099 | Date: | 06.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0839199 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/37, C07K14/025, C12N15/70, C12N1/21, C12N7/01, C07K16/08, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/70, G01N33/569, A61K39/12, A61K35/76 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C12N2710/20022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/19] | Title | German: | PAPILLOMVIREN, MITTEL ZU DEREN NACHWEIS SOWIE ZUR THERAPIE VON DURCH SIE VERURSACHTEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [1998/19] | English: | PAPILLOMAVIRUSES, AGENTS FOR DETECTING THEM AND FOR TREATING DISEASES CAUSED BY SUCH VIRUSES | [1998/19] | French: | PAPILLOMAVIRUS, AGENTS DE DEPISTAGE DE CEUX-CI ET DE THERAPIE DE MALADIES CAUSEES PAR CES VIRUS | [1998/19] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/19] | 14.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/30] | 15.02.2004 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0301289 (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE]); | [X]EP0370625 (UNIV GEORGETOWN [US]); | [YA]WO9405792 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US]); | [PX]DE4415743 (DEUTSCHES KREBSFORSCH [DE]); |