EP0846180 - TRANSGENIC PLANTCELLS AND PLANTS HAVING AN INCREASED GLYCOLYSIS RATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer BioScience GmbH Hermannswerder 20a 14473 Potsdam / DE | [2004/20] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states PlantTec Biotechnologie GmbH Forschung & Entwicklung, Hermannswerder 20a 14473 Potsdam / DE | ||
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Planttec Biotechnologie GmbH Forschung & Entwicklung, Hermannswerder 14 14473 Potsdam / DE | ||
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states Riesmeier, Jörg Ludwigsfelderstrasse 18 14165 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIESMEIER, Jörg Ludwigsfelderstrasse 18 D-14165 Berlin / DE | 02 /
TRETHEWEY, Richard Altes Rad 29 D-14469 Eiche / DE | 03 /
WILLMITZER, Lothar Am Kleinen Wannsee 34 D-14109 Berlin / DE | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96928432.2 | 08.08.1996 | [1998/24] | WO1996EP03514 | Priority number, date | DE1995129696 | 11.08.1995 Original published format: DE 19529696 | [1998/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9707221 | Date: | 27.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0846180 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C12N15/54, C12N15/55, A01H5/00 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
C12N9/2408 (EP);
C12N15/8242 (EP);
C12N15/8245 (EP);
C12N15/8261 (EP);
C12N9/1205 (EP);
Y02A40/146 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1998/24] | Title | German: | TRANSGENE PFLANZENZELLEN UND PFLANZEN MIT GESTEIGERTER GLYKOLYSERATE | [1998/24] | English: | TRANSGENIC PLANTCELLS AND PLANTS HAVING AN INCREASED GLYCOLYSIS RATE | [1998/24] | French: | CELLULES VEGETALES TRANSGENIQUES ET PLANTES A TAUX DE GLYCOLYSE AUGMENTE | [1998/24] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 30.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 27.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/28] | 05.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9428149 (MONSANTO CO ;BARRY GERARD FRANCIS (US); KISHORE GANESH MURTHY (US)) [X] 31 * page 5, line 28 - line 35 *; | [PX]WO9617069 (INST GENBIOLOGISCHE FORSCHUNG ;KOSSMANN JENS (DE); SPRINGER FRANZI) [PX] 31,32 * page 6, paragraph 7 * * page 9, paragraph L; claims 9,17 *; | [A]EP0442592 (INST GENBIOLOGISCHE FORSCHUNG) [A] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0438904 (CAMBRIDGE ADVANCED TECH) [A] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9505457 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC ;HIYOSHI TORU (JP); MINE TOSHIKI (JP); KASAOKA K) [A] 26 * the whole document *; | EP0677581 [ ] (JAPAN TOBACCO) [ ] * page 5, line 5 - line 14 * | [X] - JANG, J.C., ET AL., "Sugar sensing in higer plants", THE PLANT CELL, (199411), vol. 6, pages 1665 - 1679, XP002020817 [X] 31 * page 1675, column L, paragraph L - column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.6.11.1665 | [PX] - TRETHEWEY R ET AL, "Glucokinase activity in potato tubers: A key step for the regulation of metabolism.", ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, SAN ANTONIO, TEXAS, USA, JULY 27-31, 1996. PLANT PHYSIOLOGY (ROCKVILLE) 111 (2 SUPPL.). 1996. 169., XP002020818 [PX] 1-14,17-20,26-29,31-35 * see abstract 798 * | [A] - SONNEWALD, ET AL., "Transgenic tobacco plants expressing yeast-derived invertase in either the cytosol, vacuole or apoplast: a powerful tool for studying sucrose metabolism and sink/source interactions", THE PLANT JOURNAL, (1991), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 95 - 106, XP002020819 [A] 1-35 * page 104, column L * | [A] - BURRELL, M.M., ET AL., "Genetic manipulation of 6-phosphofructokinase in potato tubers", PLANTA, (1994), vol. 194, pages 95 - 101, XP002020820 [A] 26 * the whole document * | [A] - HAJIREZAEI, M., ET AL., "Transgenic potato plants with strongly decreased expression of pyrophosphate:fructose-6-phosphate phosphotransferase show no visible phenotype and only minor changes in metabolic fluxes in their tubers", PLANTA, (1994), vol. 192, pages 16 - 30, XP002020821 [A] 26 * the whole document * |