EP0871451 - Composition comprising plant stanol esters and the use thereof for lowering the serum cholesterol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/43] | STANOL COMPOSITION AND THE USE THEREOF | ||
[2003/38] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raisio Benecol Ltd. P.O. Box 101 21201 Raisio / FI | [1998/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESTER, Ingmar Nuijakuja 5A FIN-21260 Raisio / FI | 02 /
PALMU, Tapio Koivukuja 6 FIN-21260 Raisio / FI | 03 /
MIETTINEN, Tatu Sateenkuja 3c FIN-02100 Espoo / FI | 04 /
GYLLING, Helena Ylänkötie 5T FIN-00650 Helsinki / FI | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/30] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1998/43] | Hiltunen, Pentti Juhani Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 96928481.9 | 02.09.1996 | [1998/43] | WO1996FI00465 | Priority number, date | FI19960003126 | 09.08.1996 Original published format: FI 963126 | [1998/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9806405 | Date: | 19.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0871451 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0871451 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0871451 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 19.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/575, A61P3/06 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
A61K31/575 (EP,KR);
A23L33/11 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/575, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/43] | A61K31/575 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/43] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung enthaltend pflanzliche Stanol-Ester und ihre Verwendung zur Senkung des Cholesterin-Spiegels | [2003/38] | English: | Composition comprising plant stanol esters and the use thereof for lowering the serum cholesterol | [2003/38] | French: | Composition de stanol et son utilisation pour diminuer le taux de cholestérol sérique | [2003/38] |
Former [1998/43] | STANOLHALTIGE MITTEL UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [1998/43] | STANOL COMPOSITION AND THE USE THEREOF | ||
Former [1998/43] | COMPOSITION DE STANOL ET SON UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 08.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04011018.1 / EP1452180 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.02.2005
16.02.2005
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Weena 455 / Unilever Hse, 100 Victoria Embankment, Blackfriars 3013 AL Rotterdam / London EC4Y 0DY / NL Opponent's representative Waldren, Robin Michael, et al, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.02.2005
16.02.2005
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Waldren, Robin Michael, et al, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.02.2005
16.02.2005
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Waldren, Robin Michael, et al, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
Former [2005/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.02.2005
16.02.2005
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde, et al, et al Unilever Intellectual Property Group, P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | 18.03.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.09.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.09.2007 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.10.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.10.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 06.05.2008 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | 29.05.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 29.05.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.06.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 12.05.2004 | LU | 02.09.2004 | MC | 30.09.2004 | [2007/16] |
Former [2005/22] | FI | 12.05.2004 | |
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 12.05.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5244887 (STRAUB CARL D [US]); | [A]US5502045 (MIETTINEN TATU [FI], et al) | [X] - ATHEROSCLEROSIS, Volume 24, 1976, MICHIHIRO SUGANO et al., "Lipid-Lowering Activity of Phytostanols in Rats", pages 301-309. | Opposition | - Mattson et al., Journal of Nutrition 107 (1977) pp. 1139-1146 | - Heinemann et al., European Journal of Clinical Investigation (1993) 23, pp. 827-831 | - Dutta et al., J Sci Food Agric 71 (1996), pp. 383-391 | - Lees et at., Atherosclerosis, 28 (1977), pp. 325-338 | - Chemical structural formulae of sterois and stanols | - The Penguin Dictionary of Chemistry, Second Edition (1990), p. 361 | - Pollak O.J., Pharmac. Ther., vol. 31 (1995), pp. 177-208 | - Gylling H. et al., Diabetologic (1994) 37, pp. 773-780 | - Loeb W.F. et al., "The clinical chemistry of laboratory animals" (1989), pp. 106-107 | - W.H. Ling et al., "Dietary phytosterois: A review of metabolism, benefits and side effects" Life Sciences, 36 (1995), pp. 195-206 | - Milkova Ts. et al., "Sterol composition of bulgarian soya and corn oils" Die Nahrung, 21 (1997), pp. 7-12 | - Luetjohann D. et al., "Sterol absorption and sterol balance in phytosterolemia evaluated by deuterium-labeld sterois: effects of sitostanol treatment" J. Lipid Research 36 (1995), pp. 1763-1773 |