EP0847455 - PRODUCTION OF DIAMOND DRESSERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consort Precision Diamond Company Limited Unit 6, Clwyd Industrial Estate Kimmel Bay, Rhyl Clwyd LL18 5JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states Consort Precision Diamond Company Limited Unit 6, Clwyd Industrial Estate Kimmel Bay, Rhyl, Clwyd LL18 5JA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORRIS, Peter, David Bryniau Bryn Mair Avenue Abergele Clwyd LL22 7AT / GB | 02 /
NOAKES, Stephen, Leslie 29 Woodhill Road Colwyn Bay Clwyd LL29 7ES / GB | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Lyons, Andrew John Marks & Clerk LLP Tower Building Water Street Liverpool L3 1BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Lyons, Andrew John ROYSTONS, Tower Building, Water Street Liverpool L3 1BA, Merseyside / GB | Application number, filing date | 96928616.0 | 30.08.1996 | [1998/25] | WO1996GB02132 | Priority number, date | GB19950017854 | 01.09.1995 Original published format: GB 9517854 | [1998/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9709469 | Date: | 13.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0847455 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0847455 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C25D15/00, B24D18/00 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
B24D18/0018 (EP);
C25D15/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/25] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON SCHLEIFWERKZEUGEN | [1998/25] | English: | PRODUCTION OF DIAMOND DRESSERS | [1998/25] | French: | FABRICATION DE DRESSEURS AU DIAMANT | [1998/25] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/25] | 04.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.05.1999 | CH | 06.05.1999 | FI | 06.05.1999 | LI | 06.05.1999 | NL | 06.05.1999 | SE | 06.05.1999 | DK | 06.08.1999 | PT | 06.08.1999 | ES | 18.11.1999 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/46] | BE | 06.05.1999 | |
CH | 06.05.1999 | ||
FI | 06.05.1999 | ||
LI | 06.05.1999 | ||
NL | 06.05.1999 | ||
SE | 06.05.1999 | ||
DK | 06.08.1999 | ||
PT | 06.08.1999 | ||
Former [2003/13] | BE | 06.05.1999 | |
CH | 06.05.1999 | ||
FI | 06.05.1999 | ||
LI | 06.05.1999 | ||
NL | 06.05.1999 | ||
SE | 06.05.1999 | ||
PT | 06.08.1999 | ||
Former [2003/09] | BE | 06.05.1999 | |
CH | 06.05.1999 | ||
FI | 06.05.1999 | ||
LI | 06.05.1999 | ||
NL | 06.05.1999 | ||
PT | 06.08.1999 | ||
Former [2001/29] | BE | 06.05.1999 | |
CH | 06.05.1999 | ||
FI | 06.05.1999 | ||
LI | 06.05.1999 | ||
PT | 06.08.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | BE | 06.05.1999 | |
CH | 06.05.1999 | ||
LI | 06.05.1999 | ||
PT | 06.08.1999 | ||
FI | 07.08.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 06.05.1999 | |
PT | 06.08.1999 | ||
FI | 07.08.1999 | ||
CH | 11.08.1999 | ||
LI | 11.08.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | BE | 06.05.1999 | |
PT | 06.08.1999 | ||
FI | 07.08.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | BE | 06.05.1999 | |
FI | 07.08.1999 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4737162 (GRAZEN ALFRED [US]) [X] 1,2,6-8,15,22,23,27,29,30 * column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 16 - line 18 * * column 2, line 54 - line 61 ** column 3, line 5 - line 12 * |