EP0853485 - THERAPEUTIC ADMINISTRATION OF HEMOGLOBIN IN CARDIAC ARREST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/30] | For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURHOP, Kenneth, E. 1230 Regent Drive Mundelein, IL 60060 / US | 02 /
CHOW, Moses, S., S. 189 Highwood Drive South Glastonbury, CT 06073 / US | [1998/30] | Representative(s) | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [1998/30] | MacGregor, Gordon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 96928960.2 | 20.08.1996 | [1998/30] | WO1996US13512 | Priority number, date | US19950540115 | 06.10.1995 Original published format: US 540115 | [1998/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9712627 | Date: | 10.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0853485 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.04.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/16, A61K35/14, C07K14/00 | [1998/30] | CPC: |
A61K38/42 (EP,US);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/42, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/30] | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE GABE VON HÄMOGLOBIN BEI HERZSTILLSTAND | [1998/30] | English: | THERAPEUTIC ADMINISTRATION OF HEMOGLOBIN IN CARDIAC ARREST | [1998/30] | French: | ADMINISTRATION THERAPEUTIQUE D'HEMOGLOBINE AU COURS D'UN ARRET CARDIAQUE | [1998/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.1998 | Search fee paid | 13.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/30] | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/50] | 09.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5194590 (SEHGAL LAKSHMAN R [US], et al) [X] 1-10,15,16 * col.3, l.26-54; col.4, l.28-40; claim 1 * | [X] - JESCH FH ET AL, "Oxygen-transporting fluids and oxygen delivery with hemodilution.", CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE, APR 1982, 10 (4) P270-4, UNITED STATES, XP000918364 [X] 1-10,15,16 * p.270, 2nd col., 1st full par., l.6-7); p.273-274, conclusions, see in part. p.274, 2nd full par. * | [Y] - DUNLAP ET AL, "Resuscitation with diaspirin crosslinked hemoglobin in a pig", ARTIFICIAL CELLS BLOOD SUBSTITUTES AND IMMOBILIZATION BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 39 - 61, XP000917146 [Y] 1-10,15,16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/10731199509117667 | [Y] - LEONOV Y ET AL, "Hypertension with hemodilution prevents multifocal cerebral hypoperfusion after cardiac arrest in dogs.", STROKE, JAN 1992, 23 (1) P45-53, UNITED STATES, XP000918368 [Y] 1-10,15,16 * abstract, see in part. conclusions * | International search | [Y]US5413558 (PARADIS NORMAN A [US]); | [YP]US5498421 (GRINSTAFF MARK W [US], et al) | [Y] - ADULT BASIC LIFE SUPPORT. JAMA, 28 October 1992, Vol. 268, No. 16, "Emergency Cardiac Care Committee and Subcommittees, American Heart Association. Guidelines for Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation and Emergency Cardiac Care", pages 2184-2198. |