EP0847635 - OPTICAL SATELLITE FEEDERLINKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DE | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ericsson Inc. 6300 Legacy Drive MS EVW 2-C-2 Plano, TX 75024 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Ericsson Inc. 6300 Legacy Drive, MS EVW 2-C-2 Plano, TX 75024 / US | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Ericsson Inc. 6300 Legacy, MS EVW 2-C-2 Plano, TX 75024 / US | ||
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states ERICSSON INC. 7001 Development Drive, P.O. Box 13969 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENT, Paul, W. Stehags Prästgärd S-240 36 Stehag / SE | 02 /
HASSAN, Amer, A. 412 Key West Mews Cary, NC 27513 / US | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Kista RAN Implementation & Core (PU-KRIC) Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan, et al Ericsson AB, Patent Unit Radio Networks 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/16] | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB, Patent Unit Radio Access 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/12] | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB Common Patent Department 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1998/25] | Norin, Klas, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB Common Patent Department KI/ERA/JT/P 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 96928997.4 | 26.08.1996 | [1998/25] | WO1996US13597 | Priority number, date | US19950519943 | 28.08.1995 Original published format: US 519943 | [1998/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9708855 | Date: | 06.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0847635 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0847635 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/105, H04B7/185 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
H04B10/118 (EP,KR,US);
H04B10/807 (EP,US);
H04B7/18532 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [1998/25] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE VERBINDUNGEN ZWISCHEN BODENSTATIONEN UND SATELLITEN | [1998/25] | English: | OPTICAL SATELLITE FEEDERLINKS | [1998/25] | French: | LIAISONS OPTIQUES DE CONNEXION A UN SATELLITE | [1998/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/25] | 25.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 31.03.2004 | SE | 30.06.2004 | DE | 01.07.2004 | [2005/14] |
Former [2004/40] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
SE | 30.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9519066 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE COMMUNICAT [US]) [X] 1,7,9,12,13 * page 15, line 1 - line 33 * * page 19, line 30 - page 20, line 5 * * page 28, line 29 - page 29, line 28 * * page 31, line 3 - line 18 * [Y] 8; | [X]EP0624008 (LORAL SPACE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,7,9,12,13 * column 4, line 17 - column 5, line 33 * * figures 1,2 *; | [XY] - SHIKATANI ET AL, "ETS-VI experimental optical inter-satellite communication system", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, BOSTON, US, (19890611), pages 1600 - 1604, XP000075412 [X] 1-6,10,11 * page 1602, column R, line 16 - line 37 * * figures 1,3; table 1 * [Y] 8 | [A] - DUCHET ET AL, "Space power supply networks using laser beams", SPACE POWER, US, (1992), vol. 11, no. 3-4, pages 241 - 250, XP000612691 [A] 1-5 * page 243, paragraph 2; figure 4 * | [A] - CONNER ET AL, "Laser communication uplinks and downlinks", HIGH DATA RATE ATMOSPHERIC AND SPACE COMMUNICATIONS, BOSTON, US, (19880908), pages 62 - 71, XP000041315 [A] 1-5,8,10,11 |