EP0848796 - "LIVING FLAME"-TYPE GAS BURNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2000 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FONDERIES DU LION S.A. Route Axiale 5 B-5660 Frasnes-lez-Couvin / BE | For all designated states Thermic Investments Boulevard Royal 4, BP 758 2017 Luxembourg / LU | [1998/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERLAIMONT, Claude Route Axiale 5 B-5660 Frasnes-Lez-Couvin / BE | 02 /
CHAMPION, Raymond Rue de la Technologie 47-49 B-1080 Bruxelles / BE | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Michel, et al Office van Malderen 85/043 Boulevard de la Sauvenière 4000 Liège / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | Van Malderen, Michel, et al Office van Malderen 85/043 Boulevard de la Sauvenière 4000 Liège / BE | Application number, filing date | 96929142.6 | 04.09.1996 | [1998/26] | WO1996BE00092 | Priority number, date | BE19950000732 | 04.09.1995 Original published format: BE 9500732 | [1998/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9709568 | Date: | 13.03.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0848796 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0848796 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F24C3/00 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
F24C3/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/26] | Title | German: | GASBRENNER ZUR SIMULIERUNG EINER FLAMME | [1998/26] | English: | "LIVING FLAME"-TYPE GAS BURNER | [1998/26] | French: | BRULEUR A GAZ DU TYPE DIT "A FLAMMES VIVANTES" | [1998/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 13.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.1999 | FI | 24.11.1999 | GR | 24.11.1999 | NL | 24.11.1999 | SE | 24.11.1999 | PT | 24.02.2000 | [2004/07] |
Former [2003/09] | AT | 24.11.1999 | |
FI | 24.11.1999 | ||
NL | 24.11.1999 | ||
SE | 24.11.1999 | ||
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 24.11.1999 | |
FI | 24.11.1999 | ||
SE | 24.11.1999 | ||
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | AT | 24.11.1999 | |
FI | 24.11.1999 | ||
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 24.11.1999 | |
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
FI | 25.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | PT | 24.02.2000 | |
FI | 25.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/23] | FI | 25.02.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1217110 (VULCAANSOORD IJZERGIETERIJ EN [NL]) [A] 1* page 2, line 18 - line 34; figure 4 *; | [X]FR2654194 (GODIN SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 9, line 2 - line 16; figure -; claims 1-3 *; | [X]US5320520 (BARTH JAMES T [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure -; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5328356 (HAWKINSON ERIC [US]) [A] 1,5 * abstract * |