EP0896767 - INFORMATION NETWORK ACCESS APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR COMMUNICATING INFORMATION PACKETS VIA TELEPHONE LINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elastic Networks Inc. 6120 Windward Parkway Suite 100 Alpharetta, Georgia 30005 / US | [1999/38] |
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8th Floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [1999/07] | For all designated states NORTHERN TELECOM LIMITED World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th Floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERRY, John, Brian 2033 Melodi Lane Cumming, GA 30131 / US | 02 /
RICHARDS, Roger, St. Patrick 1961 Kerry Creek Drive Marietta, GA 30066 / US | [1999/07] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner, Shipley & Co, 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [1999/38] | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [1999/07] | Berkson, Michael David, et al Nortel Patents, London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96929149.1 | 11.09.1996 | [1999/07] | WO1996CA00601 | Priority number, date | US19960640705 | 01.05.1996 Original published format: US 640705 | [1999/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9741667 | Date: | 06.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0896767 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0896767 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/413, H04M11/06 | [1999/07] | CPC: |
H04L12/40032 (EP,US);
H04L12/413 (EP,US);
H04M11/062 (EP,US);
H04L12/403 (EP,US);
H04L2212/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/07] | Title | German: | NACHRICHTENNETZZUGRIFFSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON NACHRICHTENPAKETEN ÜBER TELEFONLEITUNGEN | [1999/07] | English: | INFORMATION NETWORK ACCESS APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR COMMUNICATING INFORMATION PACKETS VIA TELEPHONE LINES | [1999/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACCES A UN RESEAU D'INFORMATIONS ET TECHNIQUES PERMETTANT DE TRANSMETTRE DES PAQUETS DE DONNEES D'INFORMATION SUR DES LIGNES TELEPHONIQUES | [1999/07] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/07] | 02.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.01.2003 | CH | 22.01.2003 | FI | 22.01.2003 | GR | 22.01.2003 | IT | 22.01.2003 | LI | 22.01.2003 | NL | 22.01.2003 | DK | 22.04.2003 | PT | 22.04.2003 | SE | 22.04.2003 | ES | 30.07.2003 | IE | 11.09.2003 | LU | 11.09.2003 | MC | 30.09.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 22.01.2003 | |
CH | 22.01.2003 | ||
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
LI | 22.01.2003 | ||
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
DK | 22.04.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
IE | 11.09.2003 | ||
LU | 11.09.2003 | ||
MC | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/40] | AT | 22.01.2003 | |
CH | 22.01.2003 | ||
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
LI | 22.01.2003 | ||
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
DK | 22.04.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
IE | 11.09.2003 | ||
LU | 11.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 22.01.2003 | |
CH | 22.01.2003 | ||
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
LI | 22.01.2003 | ||
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
DK | 22.04.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
LU | 11.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 22.01.2003 | |
CH | 22.01.2003 | ||
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
LI | 22.01.2003 | ||
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
DK | 22.04.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 22.01.2003 | |
CH | 22.01.2003 | ||
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
LI | 22.01.2003 | ||
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
DK | 22.04.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 22.01.2003 | |
CH | 22.01.2003 | ||
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
LI | 22.01.2003 | ||
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | CH | 22.01.2003 | |
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
LI | 22.01.2003 | ||
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | CH | 22.01.2003 | |
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
LI | 22.01.2003 | ||
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | CH | 22.01.2003 | |
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
LI | 22.01.2003 | ||
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 22.01.2003 | |
LI | 22.01.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 22.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8500486 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]) [A] 1,17,31,36,41 * abstract *; | [A]EP0164244 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1,17,31,36,41 * abstract *; | [A]WO9423515 (MULTI TECH SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,17,31,36,41 * page 6 - page 7, line 15 * * page 10, line 26 - page 11, line 8 *; | [A] - ANDERSON J M, "PIPES & TYPES: OPTIONS FOR DELIVERING BROADBAND SERVICES TO RESIDENTIAL SUBSCRIBERS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SOUTHCON CONFERENCE, FORT LAUDERDALE, MAR. 7 - 9, 1995, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19950307), pages 250 - 254, XP000531196 | Examination | EP0577901 | US5367516 |