EP0790060 - SUBSTANCE AMELIORANT LE METABOLISME DES GRAISSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/34] | LIPID METABOLISM AMELIORANT | ||
[2003/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORI, Goro 2-403-1-401, Arakawaoki-Nishi-ku Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-11 / JP | 02 /
MATSUOKA, Kazuhiro 1-18-20, Motoizumi Komae-shi, Tokyo 201 / JP | 03 /
SATO, Iwao 17-22-204, Bunkyo-cho Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300 / JP | 04 /
NAGAOKA, Satoshi 2-55-1, Yajima-cho Gifu-shi, Gifu 500 / JP | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Harding, Charles Thomas D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Harding, Charles Thomas D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96929553.4 | 06.09.1996 | [1997/34] | WO1996JP02549 | Priority number, date | JP19950228928 | 06.09.1995 Original published format: JP 22892895 | [1997/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9709059 | Date: | 13.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0790060 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0790060 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.03.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/02, A61K38/01, C07K1/02, C07K14/415, C07K14/47, A61P3/04 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
A61K38/17 (EP,US);
A61K38/02 (KR);
A21D13/80 (EP,US);
A21D2/268 (EP,US);
A21D2/32 (EP,US);
A23J3/16 (EP,US);
A23J3/18 (EP,US);
A23J3/34 (EP,US);
A23J7/00 (EP,US);
A23L13/67 (EP,US);
A23L33/17 (EP,US);
A23L33/18 (EP,US);
A61K38/01 (EP,KR,US);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1997/34] | A61K38/02, A61K38/01, C07K1/02, C07K14/415, C07K14/47 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/34] | Extension states | AL | 20.05.1997 | LT | 20.05.1997 | LV | 20.05.1997 | SI | 20.05.1997 | Title | German: | WIRKSTOFF FÜR VERBESSERTEN FETTSTOFFWECHSEL | [1997/34] | English: | SUBSTANCE AMELIORANT LE METABOLISME DES GRAISSES | [2003/25] | French: | SUBSTANCE AMELIORANT LE METABOLISM DES GRAISSES | [2003/24] |
Former [1997/34] | LIPID METABOLISM AMELIORANT | ||
Former [1997/34] | AGENT LIPIDIQUE D'AMELIORATION DU METABOLISME | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.1997 | Translation filed | 20.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.1997 | Search fee paid | 20.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 09.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.11.2003 | BE | 12.11.2003 | FI | 12.11.2003 | DK | 12.02.2004 | GR | 12.02.2004 | SE | 12.02.2004 | ES | 23.02.2004 | PT | 12.04.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/52] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
BE | 12.11.2003 | ||
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
DK | 12.02.2004 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
ES | 23.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
DK | 12.02.2004 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
ES | 23.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
DK | 12.02.2004 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 12.11.2003 | |
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 12.02.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH03297364 ; | [X]JPS6452708 ; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 07, Database accession no. 1992-053592, XP002150235 & JPH03297364 A 19911227 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD) [X] 1-6,11,19-21 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890606), vol. 013, no. 241, Database accession no. (C - 604), & JP01052708 A 19890228 (NISSHIN OIL MILLS LTD:THE) [X] 1-6,11,19-21 * abstract * | [DA] - C.R. SIRTORI ET AL., "CHOLESTEROL-LOWERING AND HDL-RAISING PROPERTIES OF LECITHINATED SOY PROTEINS IN TYPE II HYPERLIPIDEMIC PATIENTS.", ANNALS OF NUTRITION & METABOLISM, BASEL, CH, (1985), vol. 29, no. 6, pages 348 - 357, XP000946969 [DA] 1-21 * the whole document * | [DA] - M.Y. JENKINS ET AL., "EFFECTS OF DIETARY PROTEIN AND LECITHIN ON PLASMA AND LIVER LIPIDS AND PLASMA LIPOPROTEINS IN RATS", NUTRITION REPORTS INTERNATIONAL, LOS ALTOS, US, (1983), vol. 28, no. 3, pages 621 - 634, XP000946947 [DA] 1-21 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS6097916 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [X]JPS61152632 (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO); | [A]JPS625920 (SHOWA SANGYO CO); | [A]JPH05320058 (SEIKAGAKU KOGYO CO LTD); | [X]WO9404177 (ROGOSIN INST [US], et al) |