EP0791939 - SOLENOID AND SOLENOID VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toto Ltd. 1-1, Nakajima 2-chome Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/35] | For all designated states TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakajima 2-chome Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 802 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAISHI, Kazuo Toto Ltd., 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokura-kita-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802 / JP | 02 /
KOGA, Itsunao Toto Ltd., 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokura-kita-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802 / JP | 03 /
SEKI, Hiroyuki Toto Ltd., 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokura-kita-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802 / JP | 04 /
HOUEI, Taisuke Toto Ltd., 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokura-kita-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802 / JP | 05 /
MATSUFUJI, Takanobu Toto Ltd., 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokura-kita-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802 / JP | 06 /
NISHIMOTO, Yoshinori Toto Ltd., 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokura-kita-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802 / JP | 07 /
KAWAHARA, Katsuhiro Toto Ltd., 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokura-kita-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802 / JP | [1997/35] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/35] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96929570.8 | 09.09.1996 | [1997/35] | WO1996JP02567 | Priority number, date | JP19950231860 | 08.09.1995 Original published format: JP 23186095 | JP19950346582 | 30.11.1995 Original published format: JP 34658295 | [1997/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9709727 | Date: | 13.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0791939 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0791939 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.03.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01F7/16 | [1997/35] | CPC: |
F16K31/0655 (EP,US);
H01F7/16 (KR);
F16K31/0675 (EP,US);
F16K31/404 (EP,US);
H01F7/1607 (EP,US);
H01F7/1615 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8122 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [1997/35] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNET UND ELEKTROMAGNETVENTIL | [1997/35] | English: | SOLENOID AND SOLENOID VALVE | [1997/35] | French: | ELECTROAIMANT ET ELECTROVANNE | [1997/35] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.1997 | Translation filed | 06.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.1997 | Search fee paid | 06.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 22.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Request for further processing for: | 20.09.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 20.09.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.10.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 13.08.2003 | [2006/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4290039 (TOCHIZAWA IKUO) [A] 1 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 63; figure - *; | [A]JPS62228684 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880324), vol. 012, no. 091, Database accession no. (M - 679), & JP62228684 A 19871007 (KEIHIN SEIKI MFG CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 13 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH07153622 (COPAL CO LTD); | [A]JPS63133604 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]JPH0246707 (MIC KOGYO KK) |