EP0846072 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING PARTIALLY ASSEMBLED SYRINGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/24] | PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF PREFILLED SYRINGES | ||
[2000/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDRAD INC. One Medrad Drive Indianola, PA 15051 / US | [2001/20] |
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states MEDRAD, INC. One Medrad Drive Pittsburgh, PA. 15051 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REILLY, David, M. 2318 Middle Road Glenshaw, PA 15116 / US | 02 /
RHINEHART, Edward, J. 425 Alpine Village Drive Monroeville, PA 15146 / US | 03 /
GELBLUM, Eugene, A. 327 Broadmoor Avenue Mt. Lebanon, PA 15228 / US | 04 /
HITCHINS, Mark 329 Chestnut Street Sewickley, PA 15143 / US | 05 /
ROBINSON, Michelle 548 West New Castle Street, No. 102 Zelienople, PA 16063 / US | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96929717.5 | 20.08.1996 | [1998/24] | WO1996US13559 | Priority number, date | US19950517645 | 22.08.1995 Original published format: US 517645 | [1998/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9708054 | Date: | 06.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0846072 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0846072 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65B55/02 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
B65B3/003 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49808 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4984 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TEILWEISE MONTIERTEN SPRITZEN | [2000/12] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING PARTIALLY ASSEMBLED SYRINGES | [2000/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE SERINGUES PARTIELLEMENT ASSEMBLEES | [2000/12] |
Former [1998/24] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLEN VON VORGEFÜLLTEN SPRITZEN | ||
Former [1998/24] | PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF PREFILLED SYRINGES | ||
Former [1998/24] | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE SERINGUES PREALABLEMENT REMPLIES | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 25.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.05.2001 | BE | 16.05.2001 | CH | 16.05.2001 | FI | 16.05.2001 | LI | 16.05.2001 | DK | 16.08.2001 | PT | 16.08.2001 | SE | 16.08.2001 | GR | 17.08.2001 | GB | 20.08.2001 | IE | 20.08.2001 | LU | 20.08.2001 | ES | 30.11.2001 | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
BE | 16.05.2001 | ||
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
FI | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
DK | 16.08.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
GB | 20.08.2001 | ||
IE | 20.08.2001 | ||
LU | 20.08.2001 | ||
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
BE | 16.05.2001 | ||
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
FI | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
DK | 16.08.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
GB | 20.08.2001 | ||
IE | 20.08.2001 | ||
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
BE | 16.05.2001 | ||
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
FI | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
DK | 16.08.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
GB | 20.08.2001 | ||
IE | 20.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
BE | 16.05.2001 | ||
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
FI | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
GB | 20.08.2001 | ||
IE | 20.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/37] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
BE | 16.05.2001 | ||
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
FI | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
GB | 20.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
BE | 16.05.2001 | ||
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
FI | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
BE | 16.05.2001 | ||
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
FI | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
BE | 16.05.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/12] | BE | 16.05.2001 | |
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 16.08.2001 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9512482 (BRACCO INT BV [NL]) [X] 1-33 * the whole document * * page 5, line 5 - line 9 * * page 5, line 28 * * page 6, line 15 - line 16 * * page 7, line 31 - page 8, line 28 *; | [A] - "Disposable syringes: Klöckner standards for mass production", PLASTICS SOUTHERN AFRICA, (199109), vol. 21, no. 4, page 10, XP002021619 [A] 1 * page 10, column R, paragraphs 6-7 * |