EP0853559 - IMPAIRED TRANSPORTATION VEHICLE OPERATOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Safety Concepts, Inc. P.O. Box 2534 Santa Fe NM 87504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/30] | For all designated states Advanced Safety Concepts, Inc. P.O. Box 2534 Santa Fe, NM 87504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITHIL, Philip W. 1274 Vallecito Drive Santa Fe, NM 87501 / US | [1998/30] | Representative(s) | Kupecz, Arpad, et al Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/30] | Kupecz, A., Drs. c.s., et al Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 96929859.5 | 27.08.1996 | [1998/30] | WO1996US14060 | Priority number, date | US19950535576 | 28.09.1995 Original published format: US 535576 | [1998/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9711862 | Date: | 03.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0853559 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0853559 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.04.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/00, G08B23/00, G06F7/70 | [1998/30] | CPC: |
G08B21/06 (EP,US);
B60N2/002 (US);
B60N2/0028 (EP);
B60N2/0029 (EP);
B60N2/0035 (EP);
B60R21/01532 (EP,US);
B60N2002/981 (EP,US);
B60N2210/12 (EP);
B60N2220/10 (EP);
B60N2220/20 (EP);
B60N2230/30 (EP);
B60R2021/01006 (EP,US);
B60R2021/01306 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/30] | Title | German: | WARNUNGSVERFAHREN BEI ÄNDERUNG DER FAHRERFÄHIGKEITEN | [1998/30] | English: | IMPAIRED TRANSPORTATION VEHICLE OPERATOR SYSTEM | [1998/30] | French: | SYSTEME D'ALERTE EN CAS D'ALTERATION DES FACULTES DU CONDUCTEUR | [1998/30] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.1998 | Search fee paid | 28.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/30] | 13.07.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3903514 (MAZZOLA JOSEPH); | [A]US4177460 (HOINSKI WALTER W [US], et al); | [A]US4354179 (FOURCADE JEAN-CLAUDE); | [A]US4836219 (HOBSON J ALLAN [US], et al); | [AP]US5465079 (BOUCHARD PAUL J [US], et al); | [AP]US5488354 (BOBBY COLVIN [US]); | [AP]US5522092 (STREB RALPH F [CA], et al) | by applicant | US5166679 |