EP0845984 - USE OF AMINOADAMANTANE COMPOUNDS AS IMMUNOREGULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA Eckenheimer Landstrasse 100 60318 Frankfurt / DE | [2003/04] |
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states Merz Pharmaceuticals GmbH Eckenheimer Landstrasse 100 60318 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states MERZ + CO. GmbH & Co. Eckenheimer Landstrasse 100-104 60318 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELSTNER, Erich, F. Wildmoosstrasse 18 D-82194 Gröbenzell / DE | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/23] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/24] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96930065.6 | 21.08.1996 | [1998/24] | WO1996EP03678 | Priority number, date | DE1995131342 | 25.08.1995 Original published format: DE 19531342 | [1998/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9707791 | Date: | 06.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0845984 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0845984 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/13, A61P37/00 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/42 (EP,US);
A61K31/13 (EP,KR,US);
A61K36/06 (EP,US);
A61K36/064 (EP,US);
A61K38/06 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/13, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/42, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/42, A61K31/13 (US,EP);
A61K36/064, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/06, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/06, A61K31/13 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [1998/24] | A61K31/13 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/24] | Extension states | LT | 12.03.1998 | LV | 12.03.1998 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON AMINOADAMANTAN-VERBINDUNGEN ALS IMMUNREGULATOREN | [1998/24] | English: | USE OF AMINOADAMANTANE COMPOUNDS AS IMMUNOREGULATORS | [1998/24] | French: | UTILISATION DE COMPOSES D'AMINOADAMANTANE EN TANT QU'IMMUNOREGULATEURS | [1998/24] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 14.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02026914.8 / EP1293201 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE4014672 (MUELLER WERNER E G PROF DR [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10 * the whole document * [A] 11,12; | [XY] - GIL M.G. ET AL., "dansylcadaverine and rimantadine inhibition of phagocytosis, paf-acether release and phosphatidylcholine synthesis in human polymorphonuclear leukocytes", IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, (1983), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 317 - 325, XP000612722 [X] 1,4,5,7,8 * page 323 - page 324 * [Y] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0162-3109(83)90037-1 | [XY] - SANCHEZ CRESPO M. ET AL., "synthesis of paf from human polymorphonuclear leukocytes", INT. J. TISSUE REACT., (1985), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 345 - 350, XP000612723 [X] 1,4,5,7,8 * page 347 - page 348 * [Y] 2 | [XY] - CLARK C. ET AL., "the antiviral drug amantadine has a direct inhibitory effect on T-lymphocytes", IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, (1989), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 195 - 204, XP000612725 [X] 1,4,5,7,8 * page 201 - page 203 * [Y] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0162-3109(89)90017-9 | [XY] - EVANS S.G. ET AL., "plasmodium-falciparum effects of amantadine on chloroquine-resistant and sensitive parasites in vitro", BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (1993), vol. 45, no. 5, pages 1168 - 1170, XP000612772 [X] 1,4,7,8 * the whole document * [Y] 2,5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-2952(93)90264-W | [XY] - PRITCHARD M.H. ET AL., "successful treatment of juvenile chronic arthritis with a specific antiviral agent", BR. J. RHEUMATOL., (1989), vol. 28, no. 6, pages 521 - 524, XP000612739 [X] 1,4,7,8 * the whole document * [Y] 2,5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/rheumatology/28.6.521 | [A] - MIRAND E.A. ET AL., "studies of amantadine against Friend virus disease in mice", EXP. MED. SURG., (1965), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 239 - 242, XP000612726 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |