EP0790904 - ROTARY CONTACTOR WITH A SHORT STRIP, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO ELECTRONIQUE 2 rue Fernand Pouillon 94042 Creteil Cédex / FR | [1997/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAGIER, Daniel 135, rue Ombraies F-92000 Nanterre / FR | [1997/35] | Representative(s) | Gamonal, Didier, et al Valeo Management Services Propriété Industrielle 2 Rue Andrée Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/35] | Gamonal, Didier, et al Valeo Management Services Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle, B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 96930229.8 | 09.09.1996 | [1997/35] | WO1996FR01376 | Priority number, date | FR19950010691 | 07.09.1995 Original published format: FR 9510691 | [1997/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9709202 | Date: | 13.03.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0790904 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0790904 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02 | [1997/35] | CPC: |
B60R16/027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB [1997/35] | Title | German: | KURZTBANDDREHSCHALTER FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [1997/35] | English: | ROTARY CONTACTOR WITH A SHORT STRIP, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR VEHICLES | [1997/35] | French: | CONTACTEUR TOURNANT A RUBAN COURT, NOTAMMENT POUR VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES | [1997/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 16.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3908179 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5,13,14 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2282014 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,13 * page 6, line 19 - page 8, line 34; figures 3A-5 *; | [A]US5171153 (KUBOTA KAZUHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,13,14 * column 1, line 49 - column 3, line 59 * * column 4, line 28 - column 8, line 56; figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP0478455 (JAEGER [FR]) [A] 1-5,13,14 * column W *; | [A]WO9502263 (VALEO ELECTRONIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |