blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0851885

EP0851885 - CROSS-LINKED BIOBASED MATERIALS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 05.06.2002  [2002/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/28]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / AFZALI-ARDAKANI, Ali
9-1 Woodland Drive
Yorktown Heights, NY 10598 / US
02 / GELORME, Jeffrey, Donald
30 Hemingway Street
Plainville, CT 06062 / US
03 / KOSBAR, Laura, Louise
1734 Horton Road
Mohegan Lake, NY 10547 / US
[1998/28]
Representative(s)Moss, Robert Douglas
IBM United Kingdom Limited
Intellectual Property Department
Hursley Park
Winchester
Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/28]Moss, Robert Douglas
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park
Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date96930255.312.09.1996
[1998/28]
WO1996GB02246
Priority number, dateUS1995052988918.09.1995         Original published format: US 529889
US1995052984918.09.1995         Original published format: US 529849
US1995052993218.09.1995         Original published format: US 529932
[1998/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9711109
Date:27.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0851885
Date:08.07.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0851885
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.1997
ClassificationIPC:C08H5/02, H05K1/03
[1998/28]
CPC:
C08H6/00 (EP); C08L97/005 (EP); H05K1/0313 (EP);
H05K1/0366 (EP); H05K2201/0284 (EP); H05K2201/0293 (EP);
H05K2203/178 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1998/28]
TitleGerman:VERNETZTE BIO-BASIERTE MATERIALIEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG[1998/28]
English:CROSS-LINKED BIOBASED MATERIALS AND USES THEREOF[1998/28]
French:MATERIAUX RETICULES A BASE BIOLOGIQUE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[1998/28]
Entry into regional phase06.02.1998National basic fee paid 
06.02.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
06.02.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/28]
20.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
18.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
08.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.1999Fee for grant paid
07.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE05.01.2000
[2002/23]
Cited inInternational search[X]US4131573  (BROWN WYNFORD);
 [X]US4769434  (VAN DER KLASHORST GERRIT H [ZA], et al);
 [A]GB2281709  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.