EP0851782 - GOLF AID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salmon, Keith William Trelawns, Tredragon Road, Mawgan Porth Newquay Cornwall TR8 4DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | For all designated states Salmon, Keith William Trelawns, Tredragon Road, Mawgan Porth Newquay, Cornwall TR8 4DQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/28] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Ivor Stanley Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | Harrison, Ivor Stanley Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 96930292.6 | 18.09.1996 | [1998/28] | WO1996GB02286 | Priority number, date | GB19950019121 | 19.09.1995 Original published format: GB 9519121 | GB19950024014 | 23.11.1995 Original published format: GB 9524014 | [1998/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9710879 | Date: | 27.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0851782 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0851782 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A63B69/36 | [1998/28] | CPC: |
A63B69/3614 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, SE [1998/28] | Title | German: | HILFSVORRICHTUNG BEIM GOLFSPIEL | [1998/28] | English: | GOLF AID | [1998/28] | French: | ACCESSOIRE DE GOLF | [1998/28] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/28] | 13.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 05.12.2001 | SE | 05.03.2002 | DE | 06.03.2002 | ES | 27.06.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/04] | SE | 05.03.2002 | |
DE | 06.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 05.03.2002 | |
DE | 06.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 05.03.2002 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5401030 (HALLIBURTON RONALD [US]) [X] 1,3,8-10,13 * column W * [A] 7; | [XY]US3106403 (KIRKMAN FREDRICK J) [X] 1,4,6,8 * column 2, line 18 - column 4, line 48; figures 1-5 * [Y] 5; | [Y]US5170664 (HIRSH LOUIS S [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 17; figures 5-9 *; | [X]US2787470 (BARRUS RUSSELL W) [X] 1,8,11,13 * column W *; | [X]US3820795 (TAYLOR D) [X] 1,3,4,6-8 * column W *; | [A]US5207429 (WALMSLEY RICHARD G [AU], et al) [A] 1,2,4,6 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 15; figures 1,2,5 * |