EP0858345 - USE OF MUTEINS OF WILD-TYPE CYTOKINES AS IMMUNOGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISTITUTO DI RICERCHE DI BIOLOGIA MOLECOLARE P. ANGELETTI S.P.A. Via Pontina Km. 30.600 00040 Pomezia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states ISTITUTO DI RICERCHE DI BIOLOGIA MOLECOLARE P. ANGELETTI S.P.A. Via Pontina Km. 30,600 00040 Pomezia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CILIBERTO, Gennaro Viale Gorgia di Leontini, 330/19 I-00124 Casalpalocco / IT | 02 /
SAVINO, Rocco Via della Tecnica, 76 I-00040 Roma / IT | 03 /
CORTESE, Riccardo Via Massimiliano Massimo, 16 I-00144 Roma / IT | [1998/34] | Representative(s) | Di Cerbo, Mario, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra 38-39 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | Di Cerbo, Mario, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra 39 00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 96930345.2 | 22.08.1996 | [1998/34] | WO1996IT00164 | Priority number, date | IT1995RM00589 | 01.09.1995 Original published format: IT RM950589 | [1998/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9709064 | Date: | 13.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0858345 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0858345 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
A61K39/0008 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (KR);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/34] | Title | German: | MUTEINE VON WILDTYP-CYTOKINEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS IMMUNOGENE | [1998/34] | English: | USE OF MUTEINS OF WILD-TYPE CYTOKINES AS IMMUNOGENS | [1998/34] | French: | EMPLOI DE MUTEINES DE CYTOKINES DE TYPE SAUVAGE COMME IMMUNOGENES | [1998/34] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/34] | 04.08.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 07.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 10.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9402512 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 64 - page 69 * * page 11, line 11 - line 23 *; | [A]WO9411402 (ANGELETTI P IST RICHERCHE BIO [IT], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9500852 (ANGELETTI P IST RICHERCHE BIO [IT], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [PX] - SPORENO E ET AL, "Human interleukin-6 receptor super-antagonists with high potency and wide spectrum on multiple myeloma cells.", BLOOD 87 (11). 1996. 4510-4519, XP000612195 [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * |