blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0847552

EP0847552 - AN APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING MULTIPLY-ADD OPERATIONS ON PACKED DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.09.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 21.01.2004  [2004/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/25]For all designated states
INTEL CORPORATION
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PELEG, Alexander, D.
38 Hannah Street
31015 Haifa / IL
02 / MITTAL, Millind
1149 Hillside Boulevard
S. San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
03 / MENNEMEIER, Larry, M.
P.O. Box 587
Boulder Creek, CA 95006 / US
04 / EITAN, Benny
25 Stephen Wise
31015 Haifa / IL
05 / DULONG, Carole
18983 Harleigh Drive
Saratoga, CA 95070 / US
06 / KOWASHI, Eiichi
2-8-10 Kubodai
Ryugasaki 301 / JP
07 / WITT, Wolf
2622 San Antonia Drive
Walnut Creek, CA 94598 / US
08 / LIN, Derrick, Chu
113 Barkentine Street
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
09 / BINDAL, Ahmet
1243 Valerian Court 3
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
10 / FISHER, Stephen, A.
11108 Riverlite Court
Boulder Creek, CA 95006 / US
11 / BUI, Tuan, H.
14267 South 12th Place
Phoenix, AZ 85048 / US
[1998/25]
Representative(s)Wombwell, Francis
Forresters
15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead
Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/25]Wombwell, Francis
Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB
Application number, filing date96930495.507.08.1996
[1998/25]
WO1996US12799
Priority number, dateUS1995052206731.08.1995         Original published format: US 522067
US1996060621223.02.1996         Original published format: US 606212
[1998/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9708610
Date:06.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0847552
Date:17.06.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0847552
Date:30.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.03.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:G06F7/00, G06F7/52, G06F15/00, G06F15/76, G06F15/78, G06F15/80, G06F7/544
[2000/02]
CPC:
G06F7/5324 (EP); G06F15/7857 (EP); G06F17/147 (EP);
G06F17/16 (EP); G06F7/4812 (EP); G06F7/5443 (EP);
G06F9/30014 (EP); G06F9/30036 (EP,US); G06T1/20 (EP);
G06F2207/3828 (EP); G06F7/49921 (EP); G06F7/5338 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [1998/25]G06F7/00, G06F7/52, G06F15/00, G06F15/76, G06F15/78, G06F15/80
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1998/25]
TitleGerman:MULTIPLIXIER-ADDIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR GEPACKTE DATEN[1998/25]
English:AN APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING MULTIPLY-ADD OPERATIONS ON PACKED DATA[1998/25]
French:DISPOSITIF DE MULTIPLICATION-ADDITION DE DONNEES COMPRIMEES[1998/25]
Entry into regional phase31.03.1998National basic fee paid 
31.03.1998Search fee paid 
31.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
31.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/25]
18.08.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
29.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.08.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
21.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2002Fee for grant paid
22.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI30.10.2002
SE30.01.2003
ES29.04.2003
[2004/04]
Former [2003/43]FI30.10.2002
SE30.01.2003
Former [2003/27]SE30.01.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0308124  (VISUAL INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIE [US]);
 [X]US5442799  (MURAKAMI TOKUMICHI [JP], et al)
International search[Y]US4771379  (ANDO HIDEKI [JP], et al);
 [A]US5442799  (MURAKAMI TOKUMICHI [JP], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.