EP0861403 - PLATE-TYPE CROSSFLOW AIR-TO-AIR HEAT EXCHANGER HAVING DUAL PASS COOLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.02.2004 [2004/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nautica Dehumidifiers Inc. 9 East Carver Street Huntington, NY 11743 / US | [1998/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STARK, Walter 26 Gristmill Lane Halesite, NY 11743 / US | [1998/36] | Representative(s) | Olsson, Jan, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB P.O.Box 1274 801 37 Gävle / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | Olsson, Jan, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB P.O.Box 1274 801 37 Gävle / SE | Application number, filing date | 96930841.0 | 12.09.1996 | [1998/36] | WO1996US14622 | Priority number, date | US19950527653 | 13.09.1995 Original published format: US 527653 | [1998/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9710476 | Date: | 20.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0861403 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0861403 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F24F3/14 | [1998/36] | CPC: |
F24F12/006 (EP,US);
F24F3/1405 (EP,US);
F24F3/153 (EP,US);
F28D9/0062 (EP,US);
F24F2012/007 (EP,US);
Y02B30/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/36] | Title | German: | LUFT-LUFT QUERSTROM-PLATTENWÄRMETAUSCHER MIT ZWEI KÜHLKANÄLEN | [1998/36] | English: | PLATE-TYPE CROSSFLOW AIR-TO-AIR HEAT EXCHANGER HAVING DUAL PASS COOLING | [1998/36] | French: | ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE AIR-AIR A ECOULEMENT TRANSVERSAL DE TYPE A PLAQUES, A REFROIDISSEMENT A DOUBLE PASSAGE | [1998/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 27.08.1998 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 14.12.1999 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request granted | 04.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.05.1998 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   29.06.1998 | 25.05.1998 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   29.06.1998 | 25.05.1998 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   29.06.1998 | 25.05.1998 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   29.06.1998 | 25.05.1998 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   29.06.1998 | 25.05.1998 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   29.06.1998 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.05.1998 | M01   Fee paid on   29.06.1998 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.11.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5309725 (CAYCE JAMES L [US]) [A] 1,7,12,15 * column 8, line 35 - line 48; figures 3,6 *; | [DA]US4761966 (STARK WALTER [US]) [DA] 1,7,12,15 * abstract *; | [A]DE2644567 (HENKE HEINZ) [A] 1,7,12,15 * figure -; claim 1 * | Examination | US3797565 | DE2616556 |