26.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
19.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
25.01.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2002 [2002/11] |
18.01.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] |
26.10.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] |
28.07.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] |
01.06.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] |
17.03.2001 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] |
03.11.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |
22.09.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.06.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
20.06.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.04.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
17.12.1999 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] |
30.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
24.08.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.05.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.02.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.11.1998 |
First examination report |
|
04.11.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.08.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.06.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] |
12.06.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] |
15.04.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.06.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.05.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|