Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4222451B | Global Dossier | 12.02.2009 | B2 | JPH11513356 | 16.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9612117 | 10.06.1996 | GB9612118 | 10.06.1996 | GB9602348 | 24.09.1996 | GB9520644 | 10.10.1995 | GB9520645 | 10.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6997296 | Global Dossier | 30.04.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9612117 | 10.06.1996 | GB9612118 | 10.06.1996 | GB9602348 | 24.09.1996 | GB9520644 | 10.10.1995 | GB9520645 | 10.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0854838 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2000 | B1 | EP0854838 | 29.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9612117 | 10.06.1996 | GB9612118 | 10.06.1996 | GB9602348 | 24.09.1996 | GB9520644 | 10.10.1995 | GB9520645 | 10.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE198187T | 15.01.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB9612117 | 10.06.1996 | GB9612118 | 10.06.1996 | GB9602348 | 24.09.1996 | GB9520644 | 10.10.1995 | GB9520645 | 10.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9610789 | 13.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9612117 | 10.06.1996 | GB9612118 | 10.06.1996 | GB9602348 | 24.09.1996 | GB9520644 | 10.10.1995 | GB9520645 | 10.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2234693 | 17.04.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9612117 | 10.06.1996 | GB9612118 | 10.06.1996 | GB9602348 | 24.09.1996 | GB9520644 | 10.10.1995 | GB9520645 | 10.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69611307T | 26.04.2001 | T2 | DE69611307D1 | 25.01.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9612117 | 10.06.1996 | GB9612118 | 10.06.1996 | GB9602348 | 24.09.1996 | GB9520644 | 10.10.1995 | GB9520645 | 10.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9520644D0 | 13.12.1995 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9520644 | 10.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9520645D0 | 13.12.1995 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9520645 | 10.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9612117D0 | 14.08.1996 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9612117 | 10.06.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9612118D0 | 14.08.1996 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9612118 | 10.06.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3035454T | 31.05.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9612117 | 10.06.1996 | GB9612118 | 10.06.1996 | GB9602348 | 24.09.1996 | GB9520644 | 10.10.1995 | GB9520645 | 10.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6660893 | 09.12.2003 | B2 | US2002168315 | 14.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9612117 | 10.06.1996 | GB9612118 | 10.06.1996 | US5150898 | 08.04.1998 | US87478601 | 05.06.2001 | GB9520644 | 10.10.1995 | GB9520645 | 10.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6270742 | 07.08.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | GB9612117 | 10.06.1996 | GB9612118 | 10.06.1996 | GB9602348 | 24.09.1996 | GB9520644 | 10.10.1995 | GB9520645 | 10.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA968228 | 10.04.1997 | B | Priority number | Date | GB9520645 | 10.10.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9713719 | Global Dossier | 17.04.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9612117 | 10.06.1996 | GB9612118 | 10.06.1996 | GB9520644 | 10.10.1995 | GB9520645 | 10.10.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1110449C | 04.06.2003 | C | CN1204297 | 06.01.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9612117 | 10.06.1996 | GB9612118 | 10.06.1996 | GB9520644 | 10.10.1995 | GB9520645 | 10.10.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2155201T | 01.05.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9612117 | 10.06.1996 | GB9612118 | 10.06.1996 | GB9520644 | 10.10.1995 | GB9520645 | 10.10.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100458671B | 03.02.2005 | B1 | KR19990064135 | 26.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9612117 | 10.06.1996 | GB9612118 | 10.06.1996 | GB9520644 | 10.10.1995 | GB9520645 | 10.10.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9802850 | 30.09.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9612117 | 10.06.1996 | GB9612118 | 10.06.1996 | GB9520644 | 10.10.1995 | GB9520645 | 10.10.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2179148 | 10.02.2002 | C2 | Priority number | Date | GB9612117 | 10.06.1996 | GB9612118 | 10.06.1996 | GB9520644 | 10.10.1995 | GB9520645 | 10.10.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW334349B | 21.06.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | GB9612117 | 10.06.1996 | GB9612118 | 10.06.1996 | GB9520644 | 10.10.1995 | GB9520645 | 10.10.1995 |